WV SB616 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-3)
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-12 - Senate requests House to concur
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-12 - Senate requests House to concur
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to post-employment benefits generally
Title
Relating to post-employment benefits generally
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-03-12 - House - Effect From Passage (Y: 87 N: 11 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-03-12 - House - Passage (Y: 82 N: 17 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-12 - House - Passage (Y: 82 N: 17 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-12 | Senate requests House to concur | |
2011-03-12 | Effective from passage (Roll No. 54) | |
2011-03-12 | Senate concurred in House amendment with amendment and passed (Roll No. 54) | |
2011-03-12 | House Message received | |
2011-03-12 | Communicated to Senate | |
2011-03-12 | Effective from passage (Roll No. 383) | |
2011-03-12 | Title amendment adopted (Voice vote) | |
2011-03-12 | Passed House (Roll No. 382) | |
2011-03-12 | Read 3rd time | |
2011-03-12 | Reordered on the calendar | |
2011-03-12 | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar | |
2011-03-11 | Committee amendment adopted (Voice vote) | |
2011-03-11 | Amendment to committee amendment adopted (voice) | |
2011-03-11 | Read 2nd time | |
2011-03-11 | From House Calendar, 2nd reading, placed on Special Calendar | |
2011-03-10 | Read 1st time | |
2011-03-10 | Immediate consideration | |
2011-03-10 | With amendment, do pass | |
2011-03-03 | To House Finance | |
2011-03-03 | To Finance | |
2011-03-03 | Introduced in House | |
2011-03-02 | Ordered to House | |
2011-03-02 | Effective from passage (Roll No. 43) | |
2011-03-02 | Passed Senate (Roll No. 43) | |
2011-03-02 | Read 3rd time | |
2011-03-02 | On 3rd reading | |
2011-03-02 | Floor amendments adopted (Voice vote) | |
2011-03-02 | Read 2nd time | |
2011-03-02 | Suspension of Constitutional Rule (Roll No. 42) | |
2011-03-02 | On 2nd reading | |
2011-03-02 | Read 1st time | |
2011-03-02 | Immediate consideration | |
2011-03-02 | On 1st reading | |
2011-03-02 | Reported do pass | |
2011-03-02 | Originating in Senate Finance |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
11 | 10 | 5d | Amended Code | Citation Text |
18 | 9A | 24 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
5 | 16 | 5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
5 | 16D | 1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
5 | 16D | 2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
5 | 16D | 6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |