WV SB615 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 26 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-03-04 - To House Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Providing ongoing mechanism for county commissioners to allow compensation increases for elected officials every two years

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Providing ongoing mechanism for county commissioners to allow compensation increases for elected officials every two years

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-26 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 249) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-04HouseTo House Finance
2019-03-04HouseWith amendment, do pass, but first to Finance
2019-02-27HouseTo House Government Organization
2019-02-27HouseTo Government Organization then Finance
2019-02-27HouseIntroduced in House
2019-02-26SenateOrdered to House
2019-02-26SenatePassed Senate (Roll No. 249)
2019-02-26SenateRead 3rd time
2019-02-26SenateOn 3rd reading
2019-02-25SenateRead 2nd time
2019-02-25SenateOn 2nd reading
2019-02-23SenateRead 1st time
2019-02-23SenateOn 1st reading
2019-02-22SenateCommittee substitute reported
2019-02-14SenateTo Government Organization
2019-02-14SenateIntroduced in Senate
2019-02-14SenateTo Government Organization
2019-02-14SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB2995 (Similar To) 2019-02-12 - To House Political Subdivisions
HB3088 (Similar To) 2019-02-12 - To House Political Subdivisions

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
774Amended CodeCitation Text

West Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback