WV SB613 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 1 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-01 - Chapter 255, Acts, Regular Session, 2023
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 1 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-01 - Chapter 255, Acts, Regular Session, 2023
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to exempt hospitals providing defined hospital services from certificate of need requirements.
Title
Relating generally to certificates of need
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-03-10 - Senate - Effective from passage (Roll No. 492) (Y: 32 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-10 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 492) (Y: 32 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-09 - House - Effective from passage (Roll No. 607) (Y: 83 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-03-09 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 606) (Y: 75 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-02-27 - Senate - Effective from passage (Roll No. 294) (Y: 31 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-27 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 294) (Y: 31 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-10 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 492) (Y: 32 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-09 - House - Effective from passage (Roll No. 607) (Y: 83 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-03-09 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 606) (Y: 75 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-02-27 - Senate - Effective from passage (Roll No. 294) (Y: 31 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-27 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 294) (Y: 31 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-01 | Senate | Chapter 255, Acts, Regular Session, 2023 |
2023-03-11 | House | Approved by Governor 3/28/2023 - House Journal |
2023-03-11 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/28/2023 - Senate Journal |
2023-03-28 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/28/2023 |
2023-03-11 | House | To Governor 3/16/2023 - House Journal |
2023-03-11 | Senate | To Governor 3/16/2023 - Senate Journal |
2023-03-16 | Senate | To Governor 3/16/2023 |
2023-03-11 | House | House received Senate message |
2023-03-10 | Senate | Completed legislative action |
2023-03-10 | Senate | Communicated to House |
2023-03-10 | Senate | Effective from passage (Roll No. 492) |
2023-03-10 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 492) |
2023-03-10 | Senate | Senate concurred in House title amendment (Voice vote) |
2023-03-10 | Senate | House Message received |
2023-03-09 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2023-03-09 | House | Effective from passage (Roll No. 607) |
2023-03-09 | House | Title amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2023-03-09 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 606) |
2023-03-09 | House | Read 3rd time |
2023-03-09 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2023-03-08 | House | Postponed on 3rd reading, Special Calendar, until 3/9 |
2023-03-08 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2023-03-07 | House | Postponed on 3rd reading, Special Calendar, until 3/8 |
2023-03-07 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2023-03-06 | House | Postponed on 3rd reading, Special Calendar, until 3/7 |
2023-03-06 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2023-03-04 | House | Postponed on 3rd reading, Special Calendar, until 3/6 |
2023-03-04 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2023-03-03 | House | Amendment rejected (Voice vote) |
2023-03-03 | House | Read 2nd time |
2023-03-03 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2023-03-02 | House | Postponed on 2nd reading, Special Calendar, until 3/3 |
2023-03-02 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2023-03-01 | House | Read 1st time |
2023-03-01 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2023-02-28 | House | Do pass |
2023-02-28 | House | To House Health and Human Resources |
2023-02-28 | House | To Health and Human Resources |
2023-02-28 | House | Introduced in House |
2023-02-27 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2023-02-27 | Senate | Effective from passage (Roll No. 294) |
2023-02-27 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 294) |
2023-02-27 | Senate | Floor amendments adopted (Voice vote) |
2023-02-27 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2023-02-25 | Senate | Laid over on 3rd reading 2/25/2023 with right to amend |
2023-02-25 | Senate | On 3rd reading with right to amend |
2023-02-24 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2023-02-24 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2023-02-23 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2023-02-23 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2023-02-22 | Senate | Committee substitute reported |
2023-02-13 | Senate | To Health and Human Resources |
2023-02-13 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2023-02-13 | Senate | To Health and Human Resources |
2023-02-13 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
16 | 2D | 10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
16 | 2D | 11 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
16 | 2D | 2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
16 | 2D | 8 | Amended Code | Citation Text |