WV SB613 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-16 - Chapter 210, Acts, Regular Session, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-16 - Chapter 210, Acts, Regular Session, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Requiring DNR include election of organ donation on hunting licenses
Title
Requiring DNR include election of organ donation on hunting licenses
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-09 - Senate - Effective from passage (Roll No. 535) (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-09 - Senate - Senate concurred in House amendments and passed bill (Roll No. 535) (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-08 - House - Effective from passage (Roll No. 624) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-08 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 623) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-22 - Senate - Effective from passage (Roll No. 190) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-22 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 190) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-09 - Senate - Senate concurred in House amendments and passed bill (Roll No. 535) (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-08 - House - Effective from passage (Roll No. 624) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-08 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 623) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-22 - Senate - Effective from passage (Roll No. 190) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-22 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 190) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-16 | Senate | Chapter 210, Acts, Regular Session, 2019 |
2019-03-09 | House | Approved by Governor 3/26/19 - House Journal |
2019-03-09 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/26/19 - Senate Journal |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/26/19 |
2019-03-09 | House | To Governor 3/22/19 - House Journal |
2019-03-09 | Senate | To Governor 3/22/19 - Senate Journal |
2019-03-22 | Senate | To Governor 3/22/19 |
2019-03-09 | Senate | Completed legislative action |
2019-03-09 | Senate | Communicated to House |
2019-03-09 | Senate | Effective from passage (Roll No. 535) |
2019-03-09 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments and passed bill (Roll No. 535) |
2019-03-09 | Senate | House Message received |
2019-03-08 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2019-03-08 | House | Effective from passage (Roll No. 624) |
2019-03-08 | House | Title amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2019-03-08 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 623) |
2019-03-08 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-03-08 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2019-03-07 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-03-07 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2019-03-06 | House | Read 1st time |
2019-03-06 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2019-03-05 | House | Do pass |
2019-02-22 | House | To House Judiciary |
2019-02-22 | House | To Judiciary |
2019-02-22 | House | Introduced in House |
2019-02-22 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2019-02-22 | Senate | Effective from passage (Roll No. 190) |
2019-02-22 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 190) |
2019-02-22 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2019-02-22 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2019-02-21 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2019-02-20 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Committee substitute reported |
2019-02-14 | Senate | To Natural Resources |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2019-02-14 | Senate | To Natural Resources |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
16 | 19 | 19 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
16 | 19 | 3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
16 | 19 | 5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
20 | 2 | 31 | Amended Code | Citation Text |