WV SB613 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-16 - Chapter 210, Acts, Regular Session, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Requiring DNR include election of organ donation on hunting licenses

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requiring DNR include election of organ donation on hunting licenses

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-09 - Senate - Effective from passage (Roll No. 535) (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-09 - Senate - Senate concurred in House amendments and passed bill (Roll No. 535) (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-08 - House - Effective from passage (Roll No. 624) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-08 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 623) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-22 - Senate - Effective from passage (Roll No. 190) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-22 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 190) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-16SenateChapter 210, Acts, Regular Session, 2019
2019-03-09HouseApproved by Governor 3/26/19 - House Journal
2019-03-09SenateApproved by Governor 3/26/19 - Senate Journal
2019-03-26SenateApproved by Governor 3/26/19
2019-03-09HouseTo Governor 3/22/19 - House Journal
2019-03-09SenateTo Governor 3/22/19 - Senate Journal
2019-03-22SenateTo Governor 3/22/19
2019-03-09SenateCompleted legislative action
2019-03-09SenateCommunicated to House
2019-03-09SenateEffective from passage (Roll No. 535)
2019-03-09SenateSenate concurred in House amendments and passed bill (Roll No. 535)
2019-03-09SenateHouse Message received
2019-03-08HouseCommunicated to Senate
2019-03-08HouseEffective from passage (Roll No. 624)
2019-03-08HouseTitle amendment adopted (Voice vote)
2019-03-08HousePassed House (Roll No. 623)
2019-03-08HouseRead 3rd time
2019-03-08HouseOn 3rd reading, Special Calendar
2019-03-07HouseRead 2nd time
2019-03-07HouseOn 2nd reading, Special Calendar
2019-03-06HouseRead 1st time
2019-03-06HouseOn 1st reading, Special Calendar
2019-03-05HouseDo pass
2019-02-22HouseTo House Judiciary
2019-02-22HouseTo Judiciary
2019-02-22HouseIntroduced in House
2019-02-22SenateOrdered to House
2019-02-22SenateEffective from passage (Roll No. 190)
2019-02-22SenatePassed Senate (Roll No. 190)
2019-02-22SenateRead 3rd time
2019-02-22SenateOn 3rd reading
2019-02-21SenateRead 2nd time
2019-02-21SenateOn 2nd reading
2019-02-20SenateRead 1st time
2019-02-20SenateOn 1st reading
2019-02-19SenateCommittee substitute reported
2019-02-14SenateTo Natural Resources
2019-02-14SenateIntroduced in Senate
2019-02-14SenateTo Natural Resources
2019-02-14SenateFiled for introduction

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
161919Amended CodeCitation Text
16193Amended CodeCitation Text
16195Amended CodeCitation Text
20231Amended CodeCitation Text

West Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback