WV SB61 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 23 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-25 - To House Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 23 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-25 - To House Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Expanding Coyote Control Program through voluntary assessment on breeding cows
Title
Expanding Coyote Control Program through voluntary assessment on breeding cows
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-23 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 26) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-25 | House | To House Finance |
2021-03-25 | House | Do pass, but first to Finance |
2021-02-24 | House | To House Agriculture and Natural Resources |
2021-02-24 | House | To Agriculture and Natural Resources then Finance |
2021-02-24 | House | Introduced in House |
2021-02-23 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2021-02-23 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 26) |
2021-02-23 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2021-02-23 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Floor amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2021-02-22 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2021-02-19 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2021-02-19 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2021-02-18 | Senate | 2nd reference dispensed |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Motion to dispense with second reference adopted |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Reported do pass, but first to Finance |
2021-02-10 | Senate | To Agriculture and Rural Development |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2021-02-10 | Senate | To Agriculture and Rural Development then Finance |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
7 | 7 | 6e | Amended Code | Citation Text |