WV SB609 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on May 1 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-01 - Chapter 146, Acts, Regular Session, 2023
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on May 1 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-01 - Chapter 146, Acts, Regular Session, 2023
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to provide for the approval of decommissioning or deconstructing of an existing power plant.
Title
Obtaining approval for decommissioning or deconstructing of existing power plant
Sponsors
Sen. Randy Smith [R] | Sen. Mike Azinger [R] | Sen. Donna Boley [R] | Sen. Rupert Phillips [R] |
Sen. Chandler Swope [R] | Sen. Jay Taylor [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-03-06 - Senate - Effective from passage (Roll No. 379) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-03-06 - Senate - Senate concurred in House amendments and passed bill (Roll No. 379) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-03-04 - House - Effective from passage (Roll No. 494) (Y: 87 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2023-03-04 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 493) (Y: 87 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2023-02-17 - Senate - Effective from passage (Roll No. 205) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-17 - Senate - Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 205) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-17 - Senate - Constitutional Rule Suspended (Roll No. 204) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-06 - Senate - Senate concurred in House amendments and passed bill (Roll No. 379) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-03-04 - House - Effective from passage (Roll No. 494) (Y: 87 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2023-03-04 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 493) (Y: 87 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2023-02-17 - Senate - Effective from passage (Roll No. 205) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-17 - Senate - Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 205) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-17 - Senate - Constitutional Rule Suspended (Roll No. 204) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-01 | Senate | Chapter 146, Acts, Regular Session, 2023 |
2023-03-08 | House | Approved by Governor 3/7/2023 - House Journal |
2023-03-08 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/7/2023 - Senate Journal |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/7/2023 |
2023-03-07 | Senate | To Governor 3/7/2023 |
2023-03-07 | House | To Governor 3/7/2023 - House Journal |
2023-03-06 | House | House received Senate message |
2023-03-06 | Senate | Completed legislative action |
2023-03-06 | Senate | Communicated to House |
2023-03-06 | Senate | Effective from passage (Roll No. 379) |
2023-03-06 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments and passed bill (Roll No. 379) |
2023-03-06 | Senate | House Message received |
2023-03-04 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2023-03-04 | House | Effective from passage (Roll No. 494) |
2023-03-04 | House | Title amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2023-03-04 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 493) |
2023-03-04 | House | Read 3rd time |
2023-03-04 | House | Amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2023-03-04 | House | Amendment reported by the Clerk |
2023-03-04 | House | Committee amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2023-03-04 | House | Amendment reported by the Clerk |
2023-03-04 | House | On 3rd reading with right to amend, Special Calendar |
2023-03-03 | House | Read 2nd time |
2023-03-03 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2023-03-02 | House | Read 1st time |
2023-03-02 | House | Immediate consideration |
2023-03-02 | House | With amendment, do pass |
2023-02-20 | House | To House Energy and Manufacturing |
2023-02-20 | House | To Energy and Manufacturing |
2023-02-20 | House | Introduced in House |
2023-02-17 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2023-02-17 | Senate | Effective from passage (Roll No. 205) |
2023-02-17 | Senate | Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 205) |
2023-02-17 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2023-02-17 | Senate | Constitutional Rule Suspended (Roll No. 204) |
2023-02-17 | Senate | Floor amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2023-02-17 | Senate | Committee amendment withdrawn by unanimous consent |
2023-02-17 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2023-02-17 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2023-02-16 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2023-02-15 | Senate | Reported do pass, with amendment |
2023-02-13 | Senate | To Energy, Industry, and Mining |
2023-02-13 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2023-02-13 | Senate | To Energy, Industry, and Mining |
2023-02-13 | Senate | Filed for introduction |