WV SB602 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-13 - Chapter 155, Acts, Regular Session, 2016
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-13 - Chapter 155, Acts, Regular Session, 2016
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to Patient Injury Compensation Fund
Title
Relating to Patient Injury Compensation Fund
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-12 - Senate - Effective July 1, 2016 (Roll No. 451) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-12 - Senate - Senate concurred in House amendments and passed bill (Roll No. 451) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-11 - House - Effective July 1, 2016 (Roll No. 528) (Y: 87 N: 8 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-11 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 527) (Y: 83 N: 12 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-02 - Senate - Effective July 1, 2016 (Roll No. 270) (Y: 33 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-02 - Senate - Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 270) (Y: 33 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-12 - Senate - Senate concurred in House amendments and passed bill (Roll No. 451) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-11 - House - Effective July 1, 2016 (Roll No. 528) (Y: 87 N: 8 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-11 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 527) (Y: 83 N: 12 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-02 - Senate - Effective July 1, 2016 (Roll No. 270) (Y: 33 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-02 - Senate - Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 270) (Y: 33 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-13 | Senate | Chapter 155, Acts, Regular Session, 2016 |
2016-03-15 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/29/16 - Senate Journal |
2016-03-29 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/29/16 |
2016-03-15 | House | Approved by Governor 3/29/2016 - House Journal |
2016-03-15 | Senate | To Governor 3/28/16 - Senate Journal |
2016-03-28 | Senate | To Governor 3/28/16 |
2016-03-15 | House | To Governor 3/28/16 - House Journal |
2016-03-12 | House | House received Senate message |
2016-03-12 | Senate | Completed legislative action |
2016-03-12 | Senate | Communicated to House |
2016-03-12 | Senate | Effective July 1, 2016 (Roll No. 451) |
2016-03-12 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments and passed bill (Roll No. 451) |
2016-03-12 | Senate | House Message received |
2016-03-11 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2016-03-11 | House | Effective July 1, 2016 (Roll No. 528) |
2016-03-11 | House | Title amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2016-03-11 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 527) |
2016-03-11 | House | Read 3rd time |
2016-03-11 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2016-03-10 | House | Committee amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2016-03-10 | House | Read 2nd time |
2016-03-10 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2016-03-09 | House | Read 1st time |
2016-03-09 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2016-03-08 | House | 2nd reference dispensed |
2016-03-08 | House | With amendment, do pass |
2016-03-03 | House | To House Judiciary |
2016-03-03 | House | To Judiciary then Finance |
2016-03-03 | House | Introduced in House |
2016-03-02 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2016-03-02 | Senate | Effective July 1, 2016 (Roll No. 270) |
2016-03-02 | Senate | Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 270) |
2016-03-02 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2016-03-02 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2016-03-01 | Senate | Floor amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2016-03-01 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2016-03-01 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2016-02-29 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2016-02-28 | Senate | Laid over on 1st reading 2/28/16 |
2016-02-27 | Senate | Laid over on 1st reading 2/27/16 |
2016-02-27 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2016-02-26 | Senate | 2nd reference dispensed |
2016-02-26 | Senate | Committee substitute reported, but first to Finance |
2016-02-15 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2016-02-15 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2016-02-15 | Senate | To Judiciary then Finance |
2016-02-15 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
29 | 12B | 10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
29 | 12D | 1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
29 | 12D | 1a | New Code | See Bill Text |
29 | 12D | 3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
55 | 7B | 9 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
55 | 7B | 9c | Amended Code | Citation Text |
55 | 7B | 9d | Amended Code | Citation Text |
59 | 1 | 11 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
59 | 1 | 28a | Amended Code | Citation Text |