WV SB600 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 19 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-28 - Rejected by Senate (Roll No. 262)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 19 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-28 - Rejected by Senate (Roll No. 262)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to powers and duties of PSC
Title
Relating to powers and duties of PSC
Sponsors
Sen. Randy Smith [R] | Sen. Ryan Ferns [R] | Sen. Ryan Weld [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-02-28 - Senate - Rejected by Senate (Roll No. 262) (Y: 17 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-28 | Senate | Rejected by Senate (Roll No. 262) |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Laid over on 3rd reading 2/27/18 |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Senator Jeffries requests to be removed as sponsor of bill |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Senator Prezioso requests to be removed as sponsor of bill |
2018-02-27 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2018-02-26 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2018-02-23 | Senate | Reported do pass |
2018-02-23 | Senate | Having been read 1st time 2/23/18 |
2018-02-23 | Senate | On 2nd reading to Government Organization |
2018-02-23 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2018-02-23 | Senate | Immediate consideration |
2018-02-23 | Senate | Committee substitute reported, but first to Government Organization |
2018-02-19 | Senate | To Energy, Industry and Mining |
2018-02-19 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2018-02-19 | Senate | To Energy, Industry and Mining then Government Organization |
2018-02-19 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
24 | 2 | 1j | Amended Code | Citation Text |