WV SB60 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-16 - Chapter 184, Acts, Regular Session, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Licensing practice of athletic training

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Licensing practice of athletic training

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-06 - House - House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 505) (Y: 91 N: 3 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - Senate - Senate amends House amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 362) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-02 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 404) (Y: 93 N: 2 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-15 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 138) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-16SenateChapter 184, Acts, Regular Session, 2019
2019-03-09HouseApproved by Governor 3/26/19 - House Journal
2019-03-09SenateApproved by Governor 3/26/19 - Senate Journal
2019-03-26SenateApproved by Governor 3/26/19
2019-03-09HouseTo Governor 3/19/19 - House Journal
2019-03-09SenateTo Governor 3/19/19 - Senate Journal
2019-03-19SenateTo Governor 3/19/19
2019-03-07SenateHouse Message received
2019-03-06HouseCompleted legislative action
2019-03-06HouseCommunicated to Senate
2019-03-06HouseHouse concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 505)
2019-03-06HouseHouse received Senate message
2019-03-05SenateSenate requests House to concur
2019-03-05SenateSenate amends House amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 362)
2019-03-05SenateHouse Message received
2019-03-02HouseCommunicated to Senate
2019-03-02HousePassed House (Roll No. 404)
2019-03-02HouseRead 3rd time
2019-03-02HouseOn 3rd reading, Special Calendar
2019-03-01HouseCommittee amendment adopted (Voice vote)
2019-03-01HouseRead 2nd time
2019-03-01HouseOn 2nd reading, Special Calendar
2019-02-28HouseRead 1st time
2019-02-28HouseOn 1st reading, Special Calendar
2019-02-27HouseWith amendment, do pass
2019-02-18HouseTo House Health and Human Resources
2019-02-18HouseTo Health and Human Resources
2019-02-18HouseIntroduced in House
2019-02-15SenateOrdered to House
2019-02-15SenatePassed Senate (Roll No. 138)
2019-02-15SenateRead 3rd time
2019-02-15SenateOn 3rd reading
2019-02-14SenateFloor amendments adopted (Voice vote)
2019-02-14SenateRead 2nd time
2019-02-13SenateLaid over on 2nd reading 2/13/19
2019-02-13SenateOn 2nd reading
2019-02-12SenateRead 1st time
2019-02-12SenateOn 1st reading
2019-02-11Senate2nd reference dispensed
2019-02-11SenateCommittee substitute reported, but first to Government Organization
2019-01-09SenateTo Health and Human Resources
2019-01-09SenateIntroduced in Senate
2019-01-09SenateTo Health and Human Resources then Government Organization
2019-01-09SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB2401 (Similar To) 2019-01-14 - To House Government Organization

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
3020A1Amended CodeCitation Text
3020A10New CodeSee Bill Text
3020A11New CodeSee Bill Text
3020A12New CodeSee Bill Text
3020A13New CodeSee Bill Text
3020A14New CodeSee Bill Text
3020A15New CodeSee Bill Text
3020A16New CodeSee Bill Text
3020A2Amended CodeCitation Text
3020A3Amended CodeCitation Text
3020A4Amended CodeCitation Text
3020A5Amended CodeCitation Text
3020A6Amended CodeCitation Text
3020A7Amended CodeCitation Text
3020A8New CodeSee Bill Text
3020A9New CodeSee Bill Text

West Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/Bill_Status/Bills_history.cfm?input=60&year=2019&sessiontype=RS&btype=bill
Texthttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/Bill_Status/bills_text.cfm?billdoc=SB60%20INTR.htm&yr=2019&sesstype=RS&i=60
Texthttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/Bill_Status/bills_text.cfm?billdoc=SB60%20SUB1.htm&yr=2019&sesstype=RS&i=60
Texthttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/Bill_Status/bills_text.cfm?billdoc=SB60%20SUB1%20ENG.htm&yr=2019&sesstype=RS&i=60
Texthttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/Bill_Status/bills_text.cfm?billdoc=SB60%20SUB1%20ENR.htm&yr=2019&sesstype=RS&i=60
Roll Callhttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/legisdocs/2019/RS/votes/senate/02-15-0138.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/legisdocs/2019/RS/votes/house/00404.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/legisdocs/2019/RS/votes/senate/03-05-0362.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/legisdocs/2019/RS/votes/house/00505.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback