WV SB596 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-2)
Status: Passed on April 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-16 - Chapter 171, Acts, Regular Session, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Adjusting voluntary contribution amounts on certain DMV forms

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Adjusting voluntary contribution amounts on certain DMV forms

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-09 - House - House adopted conference report and passed bill (Roll No. 753) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-09 - Senate - Senate adopted conference report and passed bill (Roll No. 555) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 538) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-25 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 228) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-16SenateChapter 171, Acts, Regular Session, 2019
2019-03-09HouseApproved by Governor 3/25/19 - House Journal
2019-03-09SenateApproved by Governor 3/25/19 - Senate Journal
2019-03-25SenateApproved by Governor 3/25/19
2019-03-09HouseTo Governor 3/22/19 - House Journal
2019-03-09SenateTo Governor 3/22/19 - Senate Journal
2019-03-22SenateTo Governor 3/22/19
2019-03-09SenateHouse Message received
2019-03-09HouseCompleted legislative action
2019-03-09HouseCommunicated to Senate
2019-03-09HouseHouse adopted conference report and passed bill (Roll No. 753)
2019-03-09HouseConference report received-House
2019-03-09HouseHouse received Senate message
2019-03-09SenateSenate requests House to concur
2019-03-09SenateSenate adopted conference report and passed bill (Roll No. 555)
2019-03-09SenateConference report filed - Senate
2019-03-09HouseConference report filed - House
2019-03-09HouseHouse received Senate message
2019-03-09SenateTo conference
2019-03-09SenateCommunicated to House
2019-03-09SenateSenate agreed to conference and appoints conferees: Weld, Sypolt, Jeffries
2019-03-09SenateHouse Message received
2019-03-09HouseCommunicated to Senate
2019-03-09HouseHouse appointed conferees: Harshbarger, Phillips, Hartman
2019-03-09HouseHouse refused to recede and requested conference(Voice vote)
2019-03-09HouseHouse received Senate message
2019-03-08SenateCommunicated to House
2019-03-08SenateSenate refused to concur; requested House recede(Voice vote)
2019-03-08SenateHouse Message received
2019-03-07HouseCommunicated to Senate
2019-03-07HouseTitle amendment adopted (Voice vote)
2019-03-07HousePassed House (Roll No. 538)
2019-03-07HouseRead 3rd time
2019-03-07HouseOn 3rd reading, Special Calendar
2019-03-06HouseCommittee amendment adopted (Voice vote)
2019-03-06HouseRead 2nd time
2019-03-06HouseOn 2nd reading, Special Calendar
2019-03-05HouseRead 1st time
2019-03-05HouseOn 1st reading, Special Calendar
2019-03-04HouseWith amendment, do pass
2019-02-26HouseTo House Finance
2019-02-26HouseTo Finance
2019-02-26HouseIntroduced in House
2019-02-25SenateOrdered to House
2019-02-25SenatePassed Senate (Roll No. 228)
2019-02-25SenateReported by clerk
2019-02-23SenateLaid over on 3rd reading 2/23/19
2019-02-23SenateRead 3rd time
2019-02-23SenateOn 3rd reading
2019-02-22SenateRead 2nd time
2019-02-22SenateOn 2nd reading
2019-02-21SenateRead 1st time
2019-02-21SenateOn 1st reading
2019-02-20SenateReported do pass
2019-02-13SenateTo Military
2019-02-13SenateIntroduced in Senate
2019-02-12SenateTo Military
2019-02-13SenateFiled for introduction

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
17A212aAmended CodeCitation Text

West Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback