WV SB588 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Engrossed on February 25 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-12 - Communicated to Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 25 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-12 - Communicated to Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to WV Rails to Trails Program
Title
Relating to WV Rails to Trails Program
Sponsors
Sen. Charles Trump [R] | Sen. Richard Lindsay [D] | Sen. Stephen Baldwin [D] | Sen. Ron Stollings [D] |
Sen. Robert Plymale [D] | Sen. Jack Woodrum [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-03-12 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 635) (Y: 92 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-02-25 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 227) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-25 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 227) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-12 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2022-03-12 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 635) |
2022-03-12 | House | Read 3rd time |
2022-03-12 | House | Amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2022-03-12 | House | Amendment reported by the Clerk |
2022-03-12 | House | On 3rd reading with right to amend, Special Calendar |
2022-03-11 | House | Read 2nd time |
2022-03-11 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2022-03-11 | House | Placed on Special Calender |
2022-03-11 | House | On 2nd reading, House Calendar |
2022-03-10 | House | Placed on House Calendar |
2022-03-10 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2022-03-09 | House | Read 1st time |
2022-03-09 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2022-03-08 | House | Do pass |
2022-02-25 | House | To House Government Organization |
2022-02-25 | House | To Government Organization |
2022-02-25 | House | Introduced in House |
2022-02-25 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2022-02-25 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 227) |
2022-02-25 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2022-02-25 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2022-02-24 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2022-02-23 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Committee substitute reported |
2022-02-07 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2022-02-07 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
5B | 1A | 1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
5B | 1A | 2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
5B | 1A | 3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
5B | 1A | 4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
5B | 1A | 5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
5B | 1A | 6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
5B | 1A | 9 | Amended Code | Citation Text |