WV SB585 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 23 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-24 - To House Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 23 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-24 - To House Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to strike the code section regarding locomotive power units and helper units. Court decisions have rendered this section moot.
Title
Relating to locomotive crew size
Sponsors
Sen. Craig Blair [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-03-23 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 180) (Y: 24 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-24 | House | To House Judiciary |
2017-03-24 | House | To Judiciary |
2017-03-24 | House | Introduced in House |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 180) |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2017-03-23 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2017-03-22 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2017-03-21 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Reported do pass |
2017-03-11 | Senate | To Government Organization |
2017-03-11 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2017-03-11 | Senate | To Government Organization |
2017-03-11 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
24 | 3 | 1b | Repealed Code | Citation Text |