WV SB574 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 22 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-11 - Effective Date
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 22 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-11 - Effective Date
Summary
The purpose of this bill is make December 7 a special memorial day known as "Pearl Harbor Day" to honor all West Virginians who fought in World War II.
Title
Declaring December 7 special memorial day
Sponsors
Sen. Clark Barnes [R] | Sen. Donna Boley [R] | Del. Frank Deem [R] | Sen. Jeffrey Kessler [D] |
Sen. Ron Stollings [D] | Sen. Dave Sypolt [R] | Sen. Erik Wells [D] | Sen. Bob Williams [D] |
Sen. Jack Yost [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-11 | Effective Date | |
2010-04-22 | Chapter 97, Acts, Regular Session, 2010 | |
2010-03-20 | Approved by Governor 3/31/10 - Senate Journal | |
2010-03-31 | Approved by Governor 3/31/10 | |
2010-03-20 | To Governor 3/29/10 - Senate Journal | |
2010-03-29 | To Governor 3/29/10 | |
2010-03-20 | Approved by Governor 3/31/10 - House Journal | |
2010-03-20 | To Governor 3/29/10 - House Journal | |
2010-03-13 | Completed legislative action | |
2010-03-13 | House Message received | |
2010-03-13 | Communicated to Senate | |
2010-03-13 | Passed House (Roll No. 384) | |
2010-03-13 | Read 3rd time | |
2010-03-13 | Placed on Special Calender | |
2010-03-13 | On 3rd reading, House Calendar | |
2010-03-11 | Placed on House Calender | |
2010-03-11 | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar | |
2010-03-10 | Read 2nd time | |
2010-03-10 | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar | |
2010-03-09 | Read 1st time | |
2010-03-09 | From House Calendar, 1st reading, placed on Special Calendar | |
2010-03-08 | 2nd reference dispensed | |
2010-03-08 | Do pass | |
2010-03-04 | To House Veterans' Affairs and Homeland Security | |
2010-03-04 | To Veterans' Affairs and Homeland Security then Finance | |
2010-03-04 | Introduced in House | |
2010-03-03 | Ordered to House | |
2010-03-03 | Passed Senate (Roll No. 29) | |
2010-03-03 | Read 3rd time | |
2010-03-03 | On 3rd reading | |
2010-03-02 | Read 2nd time | |
2010-03-02 | On 2nd reading | |
2010-03-01 | Reported do pass | |
2010-02-25 | On 2nd reading to Government Organization | |
2010-02-25 | Read 1st time | |
2010-02-25 | On 1st reading | |
2010-02-25 | Immediate consideration | |
2010-02-25 | Reported do pass, but first to Government Organization | |
2010-02-15 | To Military | |
2010-02-15 | To Military then Government Organization | |
2010-02-15 | Introduced in Senate | |
2010-02-15 | To Military then Government Organization | |
2010-02-15 | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
2 | 2 | 1a | Amended Code | Citation Text |
West Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.state.wv.us/Bill_Status/Bills_history.cfm?input=574&year=2010&sessiontype=RS&btype=bill |