WV SB573 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Vetoed on March 12 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-12 - Vetoed by Governor 3/30/2022 - Senate Journal
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on March 12 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-12 - Vetoed by Governor 3/30/2022 - Senate Journal
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Providing system where magistrates shall preside in certain instances outside normal court hours
Title
Providing system where magistrates shall preside in certain instances outside normal court hours
Sponsors
Sen. Charles Trump [R] | Sen. Ryan Weld [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-03-11 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 583) (Y: 89 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-11 - House - Dispensed with Constitutional Rule (Roll No. 582) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-21 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 171) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-11 - House - Dispensed with Constitutional Rule (Roll No. 582) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-21 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 171) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-12 | Senate | Vetoed by Governor 3/30/2022 - Senate Journal |
2022-03-30 | Senate | Vetoed by Governor 3/30/2022 |
2022-03-12 | House | Vetoed by Governor 3/30/22 - House Journal |
2022-03-12 | House | To Governor 3/17/22 - House Journal |
2022-03-12 | Senate | To Governor 3/17/2022 - Senate Journal |
2022-03-17 | Senate | To Governor 3/17/2022 |
2022-03-12 | Senate | House Message received |
2022-03-11 | House | Completed legislative action |
2022-03-11 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2022-03-11 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 583) |
2022-03-11 | House | Read 3rd time |
2022-03-11 | House | Dispensed with Constitutional Rule (Roll No. 582) |
2022-03-11 | House | Read 2nd time |
2022-03-11 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2022-03-11 | House | Placed on Special Calender |
2022-03-11 | House | On 2nd reading, House Calendar |
2022-03-10 | House | Placed on House Calendar |
2022-03-10 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2022-03-09 | House | Read 1st time |
2022-03-09 | House | Immediate consideration |
2022-03-09 | House | Motion to reject committee report |
2022-03-09 | House | Do pass |
2022-02-22 | House | To House Judiciary |
2022-02-22 | House | To Judiciary |
2022-02-22 | House | Introduced in House |
2022-02-21 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2022-02-21 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 171) |
2022-02-21 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2022-02-21 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2022-02-18 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2022-02-18 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2022-02-17 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Committee substitute reported |
2022-02-03 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2022-02-03 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
50 | 1 | 13 | Amended Code | Citation Text |