WV SB561 | 2018 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous SB561

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-23 - Chapter 71, Acts, Regular Session, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Increasing minimum contract price requiring execution of bond with respect to building or repairing school property

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Increasing minimum contract price requiring execution of bond with respect to building or repairing school property

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-05 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 322) (Y: 97 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-26 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 198) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-23SenateChapter 71, Acts, Regular Session, 2018
2018-03-10SenateApproved by Governor 3/27/18 - Senate Journal
2018-03-27SenateApproved by Governor 3/27/18
2018-03-10HouseApproved by Governor 3/27/18 - House Journal
2018-03-10HouseTo Governor 3/9/18 - House Journal
2018-03-09SenateTo Governor 3/9/18
2018-03-06SenateHouse Message received
2018-03-05HouseCompleted legislative action
2018-03-05HouseCommunicated to Senate
2018-03-05HousePassed House (Roll No. 322)
2018-03-05HouseRead 3rd time
2018-03-05HouseOn 3rd reading, Special Calendar
2018-03-03HouseRead 2nd time
2018-03-03HouseOn 2nd reading, Special Calendar
2018-03-02HouseRead 1st time
2018-03-02HouseOn 1st reading, Special Calendar
2018-03-01House2nd reference dispensed
2018-03-01HouseDo pass
2018-02-27HouseTo House Education
2018-02-27HouseTo Education then Finance
2018-02-27HouseIntroduced in House
2018-02-26SenateOrdered to House
2018-02-26SenatePassed Senate (Roll No. 198)
2018-02-26SenateRead 3rd time
2018-02-26SenateOn 3rd reading
2018-02-23SenateRead 2nd time
2018-02-23SenateOn 2nd reading
2018-02-22Senate2nd reference dispensed
2018-02-22SenateSenate further considered bill
2018-02-22SenateOn 2nd reading to Government Organization
2018-02-22SenateRead 1st time
2018-02-22SenateImmediate consideration
2018-02-22SenateCommittee substitute reported, but first to Government Organization
2018-02-15SenateTo Education
2018-02-15SenateIntroduced in Senate
2018-02-15SenateTo Education then Government Organization
2018-02-15SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

SB561 (Carry Over) 2017-03-08 - To Energy, Industry and Mining

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
18512Amended CodeCitation Text

West Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback