WV SB559 | 2023 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 20 2023 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-03-11 - Communicated to Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

The purpose of this bill is to expand the exceptions to spousal privilege to exclude therefrom cases in which the offense at issue was committed against any child rather than a child of one or both spouses.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to spousal privilege

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-03-11 - Senate - Senate amends House amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 573) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-09 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 605) (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-02-20 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 213) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-03-11HouseCommunicated to Senate
2023-03-11HouseHouse refused to concur; requested Senate to recede (Voice)
2023-03-11HouseHouse received Senate message
2023-03-11SenateSenate requests House to concur
2023-03-11SenateSenate amends House amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 573)
2023-03-11SenateSenate reconsidered action (voice vote)
2023-03-10SenateSenate refused to concur; requested House recede(Voice vote)
2023-03-10SenateHouse Message received
2023-03-09HouseCommunicated to Senate
2023-03-09HouseTitle amendment adopted (Voice vote)
2023-03-09HousePassed House (Roll No. 605)
2023-03-09HouseRead 3rd time
2023-03-09HouseOn 3rd reading, Special Calendar
2023-03-08HouseCommittee amendment adopted (Voice vote)
2023-03-08HouseAmendment to committee amendment adopted (voice)
2023-03-08HouseRead 2nd time
2023-03-08HouseOn 2nd reading, Special Calendar
2023-03-07HousePostponed on 2nd reading, Special Calendar, until 3/8
2023-03-07HouseOn 2nd reading, Special Calendar
2023-03-06HouseRead 1st time
2023-03-06HouseOn 1st reading, Special Calendar
2023-03-04HouseWith amendment, do pass
2023-02-20HouseTo House Judiciary
2023-02-20HouseTo Judiciary
2023-02-20HouseIntroduced in House
2023-02-20SenateOrdered to House
2023-02-20SenatePassed Senate (Roll No. 213)
2023-02-20SenateRead 3rd time
2023-02-20SenateOn 3rd reading
2023-02-17SenateRead 2nd time
2023-02-17SenateOn 2nd reading
2023-02-16SenateRead 1st time
2023-02-16SenateOn 1st reading
2023-02-15SenateReported do pass
2023-02-03SenateTo Judiciary
2023-02-03SenateIntroduced in Senate
2023-02-03SenateTo Judiciary
2023-02-03SenateFiled for introduction

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
5733Amended CodeCitation Text

West Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/Bill_Status/Bills_history.cfm?input=559&year=2023&sessiontype=RS&btype=bill
Texthttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/Bill_Status/bills_text.cfm?billdoc=sb559%20intr.htm&yr=2023&sesstype=RS&i=559
Amendmenthttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/legisdocs/chamber/2023/RS/com_amends/sb559%20h%20jud%20am%20_1.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/legisdocs/chamber/2023/RS/floor_amends/sb559%20hfa%20capito%203-8%20_1.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/legisdocs/chamber/2023/RS/floor_amends/sb559%20hfat%20capito%203-8.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/legisdocs/chamber/2023/RS/com_amends/sb559%20h%20jud%20am%20_1%20as%20amended%20adopted.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/legisdocs/chamber/2023/RS/com_amends/sb559%20h%20jud%20am%20_1%20adopted.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/legisdocs/chamber/2023/RS/floor_amends/sb559%20hfat%20capito%203-8%20adopted.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/legisdocs/chamber/2023/RS/floor_amends/sb559%20sfat%20takubo%20_1%203-10.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/legisdocs/chamber/2023/RS/floor_amends/sb559%20sfa%20takubo%20_1%203-10.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/legisdocs/chamber/2023/RS/floor_amends/sb559%20sfat%20takubo%20_1%203-10%20adopted.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/legisdocs/chamber/2023/RS/floor_amends/sb559%20sfa%20takubo%20_1%203-10%20adopted.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/legisdocs/chamber/2023/RS/floor_amends/sb559%20hfat%20capito%203-11.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/legisdocs/chamber/2023/RS/floor_amends/sb559%20hfa%20capito%203-11%20_1.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/legisdocs/2023/RS/votes/senate/02-20-0213.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/legisdocs/2023/RS/votes/house/00605.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/legisdocs/2023/RS/votes/senate/03-11-0573.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback