WV SB559 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-02-08 - To Health and Human Resources
Pending: Senate Health and Human Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Expanding comprehensive coverage for pregnant women through Medicaid

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Expanding comprehensive coverage for pregnant women through Medicaid

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-08SenateTo Health and Human Resources
2019-02-08SenateIntroduced in Senate
2019-02-08SenateTo Health and Human Resources then Finance
2019-02-08SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB2956 (Similar To) 2019-02-11 - To House Banking and Insurance
SB564 (Similar To) 2019-03-09 - To Governor 3/9/2019 - House Journal

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
516B6dAmended CodeCitation Text
9512Amended CodeCitation Text

West Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback