WV SB559 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 18 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-20 - To House Small Business, Entrepreneurship and Economic Development
Pending: House Small Business, Entrepreneurship and Economic Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 18 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-20 - To House Small Business, Entrepreneurship and Economic Development
Pending: House Small Business, Entrepreneurship and Economic Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to permit limited video lottery retailers with more than one location to sell one or more of their operations to another person.
Title
Relating to limited video lottery
Sponsors
Sen. Ryan Ferns [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-03-18 - Senate - Effective from passage (Roll No. 144) (Y: 27 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-03-18 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 144) (Y: 27 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-03-18 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 144) (Y: 27 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-20 | House | To House Small Business, Entrepreneurship and Economic Development |
2017-03-20 | House | To Small Business, Entrepreneurship and Economic Development then Judiciary |
2017-03-20 | House | Introduced in House |
2017-03-18 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2017-03-18 | Senate | Effective from passage (Roll No. 144) |
2017-03-18 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 144) |
2017-03-18 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2017-03-18 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2017-03-17 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2017-03-17 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2017-03-16 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Committee substitute reported |
2017-03-08 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2017-03-08 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
29 | 22B | 501 | Amended Code | Citation Text |