WV SB555 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-23 - Chapter 1, Acts, Regular Session, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-23 - Chapter 1, Acts, Regular Session, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Providing director of corporation not personally liable for corporation's torts
Title
Providing immunity from civil liability for qualified directors of certain governmental and nonprofit entities
Sponsors
Sen. Ryan Ferns [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-03-07 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 378) (Y: 84 N: 13 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-26 - Senate - Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 197) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-26 - Senate - Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 197) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-23 | Senate | Chapter 1, Acts, Regular Session, 2018 |
2018-03-10 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/27/18 - Senate Journal |
2018-03-27 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/27/18 |
2018-03-10 | House | Approved by Governor 3/27/18 - House Journal |
2018-03-10 | Senate | To Governor 3/19/18 - Senate Journal |
2018-03-19 | Senate | To Governor 3/19/18 |
2018-03-10 | House | To Governor 3/19/18 - House Journal |
2018-03-08 | Senate | House Message received |
2018-03-07 | House | Completed legislative action |
2018-03-07 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2018-03-07 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 378) |
2018-03-07 | House | Read 3rd time |
2018-03-07 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2018-03-06 | House | Read 2nd time |
2018-03-06 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2018-03-05 | House | Read 1st time |
2018-03-05 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2018-03-03 | House | Do pass |
2018-02-27 | House | To House Judiciary |
2018-02-27 | House | To Judiciary |
2018-02-27 | House | Introduced in House |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 197) |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2018-02-26 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2018-02-23 | Senate | Floor amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2018-02-23 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2018-02-23 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2018-02-22 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Committee substitute reported |
2018-02-15 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2018-02-15 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
31D | 8 | 831 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
55 | 7C | 3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |