WV SB552 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 20-1)
Status: Passed on May 1 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-01 - Chapter 253, Acts, Regular Session, 2023
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 20-1)
Status: Passed on May 1 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-01 - Chapter 253, Acts, Regular Session, 2023
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to normalize definitions with more recently passed abortion legislation, expand requirements for informed consent, remove liability protection for a physician regarding the prescribing of non-FDA approved drug therapy, require the Department of Health and Human resources to place enhanced information on its web page, and administrative penalties for licensed medical professionals knowingly and willfully violating article.
Title
Relating to abortion
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-03-11 - Senate - Effective from passage (Roll No. 603) (Y: 32 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-11 - Senate - Senate concurred in House amendments and passed bill (Roll No. 603) (Y: 32 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-10 - House - Effective from passage (Roll No. 717) (Y: 84 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2023-03-10 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 716) (Y: 81 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2023-03-10 - House - Dispensed with Constitutional Rule (Roll No. 715) (Y: 83 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-03-01 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 333) (Y: 31 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-11 - Senate - Senate concurred in House amendments and passed bill (Roll No. 603) (Y: 32 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-10 - House - Effective from passage (Roll No. 717) (Y: 84 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2023-03-10 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 716) (Y: 81 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2023-03-10 - House - Dispensed with Constitutional Rule (Roll No. 715) (Y: 83 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-03-01 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 333) (Y: 31 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-01 | Senate | Chapter 253, Acts, Regular Session, 2023 |
2023-03-11 | House | Approved by Governor 3/29/2023 - House Journal |
2023-03-11 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/29/2023 - Senate Journal |
2023-03-29 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/29/2023 |
2023-03-11 | House | To Governor 3/17/2023 - House Journal |
2023-03-11 | Senate | To Governor 3/17/2023 - Senate Journal |
2023-03-17 | Senate | To Governor 3/17/2023 |
2023-03-11 | Senate | Completed legislative action |
2023-03-11 | Senate | Communicated to House |
2023-03-11 | Senate | Effective from passage (Roll No. 603) |
2023-03-11 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments and passed bill (Roll No. 603) |
2023-03-11 | Senate | House Message received |
2023-03-10 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2023-03-10 | House | Effective from passage (Roll No. 717) |
2023-03-10 | House | Title amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2023-03-10 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 716) |
2023-03-10 | House | Read 3rd time |
2023-03-10 | House | Dispensed with Constitutional Rule (Roll No. 715) |
2023-03-10 | House | Amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2023-03-10 | House | Read 2nd time |
2023-03-10 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2023-03-09 | House | Read 1st time |
2023-03-09 | House | Immediate consideration |
2023-03-09 | House | With amendment, do pass, but first to Finance |
2023-03-02 | House | To House Health and Human Resources |
2023-03-02 | House | To Health and Human Resources |
2023-03-02 | House | Introduced in House |
2023-03-01 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2023-03-01 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 333) |
2023-03-01 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2023-03-01 | Senate | On 3rd reading with right to amend |
2023-02-28 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2023-02-28 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2023-02-27 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2023-02-27 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2023-02-25 | Senate | 2nd reference dispensed |
2023-02-25 | Senate | Committee substitute reported, but first to Judiciary |
2023-02-02 | Senate | To Health and Human Resources |
2023-02-02 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2023-02-02 | Senate | To Health and Human Resources then Judiciary |
2023-02-02 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
16 | 2R | 9 | Amended Code | Citation Text |