WV SB551 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 24 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-31 - To House Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 24 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-31 - To House Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Revising forms of living will, medical power of attorney, and combined medical power of attorney and living will
Title
Revising forms of living will, medical power of attorney, and combined medical power of attorney and living will
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-24 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 181) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-31 | House | To House Judiciary |
2021-03-31 | House | With amendment, do pass, but first to Judiciary |
2021-03-25 | House | To House Health and Human Resources |
2021-03-25 | House | To Health and Human Resources then Judiciary |
2021-03-25 | House | Introduced in House |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 181) |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2021-03-24 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2021-03-23 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2021-03-22 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2021-03-22 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2021-03-19 | Senate | Committee substitute reported |
2021-03-03 | Senate | To Health and Human Resources |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2021-03-03 | Senate | To Health and Human Resources |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
16 | 30 | 3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
16 | 30 | 4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |