WV SB550 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-16 - Chapter 45, Acts, Regular Session, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Declaring certain claims to be moral obligations of state

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Declaring certain claims to be moral obligations of state

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-09 - Senate - Effective from passage (Roll No. 531) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-09 - Senate - Senate concurred in House amendments and passed bill (Roll No. 531) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-08 - House - Effective from passage (Roll No. 615) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-08 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 614) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-18 - Senate - Effective from passage (Roll No. 153) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-18 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 153) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-16SenateChapter 45, Acts, Regular Session, 2019
2019-03-09HouseApproved by Governor 3/26/19 - House Journal
2019-03-09SenateApproved by Governor 3/26/19 - Senate Journal
2019-03-26SenateApproved by Governor 3/26/19
2019-03-09HouseTo Governor 3/22/19 - House Journal
2019-03-09SenateTo Governor 3/22/19 - Senate Journal
2019-03-22SenateTo Governor 3/22/19
2019-03-09SenateCompleted legislative action
2019-03-09SenateCommunicated to House
2019-03-09SenateEffective from passage (Roll No. 531)
2019-03-09SenateSenate concurred in House amendments and passed bill (Roll No. 531)
2019-03-09SenateHouse Message received
2019-03-08HouseCommunicated to Senate
2019-03-08HouseEffective from passage (Roll No. 615)
2019-03-08HousePassed House (Roll No. 614)
2019-03-08HouseRead 3rd time
2019-03-08HouseOn 3rd reading, Special Calendar
2019-03-07HouseCommittee amendment adopted (Voice vote)
2019-03-07HouseRead 2nd time
2019-03-07HouseOn 2nd reading, Special Calendar
2019-03-06HouseRead 1st time
2019-03-06HouseOn 1st reading, Special Calendar
2019-03-05HouseWith amendment, do pass
2019-02-19HouseTo House Finance
2019-02-19HouseTo Finance
2019-02-19HouseIntroduced in House
2019-02-18SenateOrdered to House
2019-02-18SenateEffective from passage (Roll No. 153)
2019-02-18SenatePassed Senate (Roll No. 153)
2019-02-18SenateRead 3rd time
2019-02-18SenateOn 3rd reading
2019-02-15SenateRead 2nd time
2019-02-15SenateOn 2nd reading
2019-02-14SenateRead 1st time
2019-02-14SenateOn 1st reading
2019-02-13SenateReported do pass
2019-02-07SenateTo Finance
2019-02-07SenateIntroduced in Senate
2019-02-07SenateTo Finance
2019-02-07SenateFiled for introduction

Subjects


West Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback