WV SB548 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 1 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-01 - Chapter 310, Acts, Regular Session, 2023
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 1 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-01 - Chapter 310, Acts, Regular Session, 2023
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to clarify what parties are entitled to redeem delinquent property and limit those that are entitled to bid on delinquent property at public auction.
Title
Clarifying what parties can redeem delinquent property and limiting those entitled to bid
Sponsors
Sen. Ryan Weld [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-03-11 - Senate - Senate concurred in House amendments and passed bill (Roll No. 591) (Y: 31 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-10 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 682) (Y: 88 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2023-02-21 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 222) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-10 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 682) (Y: 88 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2023-02-21 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 222) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-01 | Senate | Chapter 310, Acts, Regular Session, 2023 |
2023-03-11 | House | Approved by Governor 3/29/2023 - House Journal |
2023-03-11 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/29/23 - Senate Journal |
2023-03-29 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/29/23 |
2023-03-11 | Senate | To Governor 3/16/2023 - Senate Journal |
2023-03-16 | Senate | To Governor 3/16/2023 |
2023-03-11 | House | To Governor 3/16/2023 - House Journal |
2023-03-11 | House | House received Senate message |
2023-03-11 | Senate | Completed legislative action |
2023-03-11 | Senate | Communicated to House |
2023-03-11 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments and passed bill (Roll No. 591) |
2023-03-11 | Senate | House Message received |
2023-03-10 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2023-03-10 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 682) |
2023-03-10 | House | Read 3rd time |
2023-03-10 | House | Amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2023-03-10 | House | Committee amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2023-03-10 | House | Amendment to committee amendment adopted (voice) |
2023-03-10 | House | On 3rd reading with right to amend, Special Calendar |
2023-03-09 | House | Read 2nd time |
2023-03-09 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2023-03-08 | House | Read 1st time |
2023-03-08 | House | Immediate consideration |
2023-03-08 | House | With amendment, do pass |
2023-02-21 | House | To House Judiciary |
2023-02-21 | House | To Judiciary |
2023-02-21 | House | Introduced in House |
2023-02-21 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2023-02-21 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 222) |
2023-02-21 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2023-02-21 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2023-02-20 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2023-02-20 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2023-02-17 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2023-02-17 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Committee substitute reported |
2023-02-02 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2023-02-02 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2023-02-02 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2023-02-02 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
11A | 3 | 13 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
11A | 3 | 2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
11A | 3 | 38 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
11A | 3 | 45 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
11A | 3 | 45a | New Code | See Bill Text |
11A | 3 | 46 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
11A | 3 | 47 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
11A | 3 | 48 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
11A | 3 | 48a | New Code | See Bill Text |
11A | 3 | 56 | Amended Code | Citation Text |