WV SB546 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on May 1 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-01 - Chapter 76, Acts, Regular Session, 2023
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on May 1 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-01 - Chapter 76, Acts, Regular Session, 2023
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to add certain compounds to the schedule I, II, IV, and V controlled substances list and remove a substance from the schedule V list.
Title
Adding and removing certain compounds from controlled substance list
Sponsors
Sen. Mike Stuart [R] | Sen. Jack Woodrum [R] | Sen. Vince Deeds [R] | Sen. Jay Taylor [R] |
Sen. Mark Maynard [R] | Sen. Bill Hamilton [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-03-10 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 681) (Y: 91 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2023-03-09 - House - Amendment rejected (Roll No. 619) (Y: 16 N: 76 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [FAIL]
2023-03-01 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 342) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-09 - House - Amendment rejected (Roll No. 619) (Y: 16 N: 76 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [FAIL]
2023-03-01 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 342) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-01 | Senate | Chapter 76, Acts, Regular Session, 2023 |
2023-03-11 | House | Approved by Governor 3/29/2023 - House Journal |
2023-03-11 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/29/23 - Senate Journal |
2023-03-29 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/29/23 |
2023-03-11 | Senate | To Governor 3/16/2023 - Senate Journal |
2023-03-16 | Senate | To Governor 3/16/2023 |
2023-03-11 | House | To Governor 3/16/2023 - House Journal |
2023-03-11 | Senate | House Message received |
2023-03-10 | House | Completed legislative action |
2023-03-10 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2023-03-10 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 681) |
2023-03-10 | House | Read 3rd time |
2023-03-10 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2023-03-09 | House | Amendment rejected (Roll No. 619) |
2023-03-09 | House | Read 2nd time |
2023-03-09 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2023-03-08 | House | Read 1st time |
2023-03-08 | House | Immediate consideration |
2023-03-08 | House | Do pass |
2023-03-02 | House | To House Health and Human Resources |
2023-03-02 | House | To Health and Human Resources |
2023-03-02 | House | Introduced in House |
2023-03-01 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2023-03-01 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 342) |
2023-03-01 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2023-03-01 | Senate | Deferred until foot of 1st reading |
2023-03-01 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2023-02-28 | Senate | Trump floor amendments adopted (Voice vote) |
2023-02-28 | Senate | Stuart floor amendments adopted (Voice vote) |
2023-02-28 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2023-02-28 | Senate | Deferred until until foot of 2nd reading |
2023-02-27 | Senate | Laid over on 2nd reading 2/27/2023 |
2023-02-27 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2023-02-25 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2023-02-25 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2023-02-24 | Senate | Committee substitute reported |
2023-02-02 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2023-02-02 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2023-02-02 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2023-02-02 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
60A | 2 | 204 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
60A | 2 | 206 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
60A | 2 | 210 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
60A | 2 | 212 | Amended Code | Citation Text |