WV SB544 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 12 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-26 - Recommitted to Judiciary on 3rd reading
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 12 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-26 - Recommitted to Judiciary on 3rd reading
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to allow sharing of juvenile records under certain circumstances with another state which has a reciprocal agreement with this state.
Title
Allowing sharing of juvenile records under certain circumstances with reciprocal states
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-26 | Senate | Recommitted to Judiciary on 3rd reading |
2014-02-26 | Senate | Motion |
2014-02-25 | Senate | Laid over on 3rd reading 2/25/14 |
2014-02-25 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2014-02-24 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2014-02-24 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2014-02-21 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2014-02-21 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2014-02-20 | Senate | Reported do pass |
2014-02-18 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2014-02-18 | Senate | Committee substitute reported, but first to Judiciary |
2014-02-12 | Senate | To Interstate Cooperation |
2014-02-12 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2014-02-12 | Senate | To Interstate Cooperation then Judiciary |
2014-02-12 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB4504 (Similar To) 2014-04-10 - Chapter 102, Acts, Regular Session, 2014
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
49 | 7 | 1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |