WV SB543 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 30 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-31 - To House Government Organization
Pending: House Government Organization Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 30 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-31 - To House Government Organization
Pending: House Government Organization Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Establishing Chuck Yeager Mountain State Medal of Excellence
Title
Establishing Chuck Yeager Mountain State Medal of Excellence
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-30 - Senate - Effective July 1, 2021 (Roll No. 247) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-30 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 247) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-30 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 247) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-31 | House | To House Government Organization |
2021-03-31 | House | To Government Organization |
2021-03-31 | House | Introduced in House |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Effective July 1, 2021 (Roll No. 247) |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 247) |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2021-03-30 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2021-03-29 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2021-03-27 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2021-03-27 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2021-03-26 | Senate | Committee substitute reported |
2021-03-03 | Senate | To Government Organization |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2021-03-03 | Senate | To Government Organization |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Filed for introduction |