WV SB543 | 2018 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous SB543

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-23 - Chapter 199, Acts, Regular Session, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to confidentiality of medical records

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to confidentiality of medical records

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-07 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 377) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-22 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 172) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-23SenateChapter 199, Acts, Regular Session, 2018
2018-03-10SenateApproved by Governor 3/27/18 - Senate Journal
2018-03-27SenateApproved by Governor 3/27/18
2018-03-10HouseApproved by Governor 3/27/18 - House Journal
2018-03-10SenateTo Governor 3/19/18 - Senate Journal
2018-03-19SenateTo Governor 3/19/18
2018-03-10HouseTo Governor 3/19/18 - House Journal
2018-03-08SenateHouse Message received
2018-03-07HouseCompleted legislative action
2018-03-07HouseCommunicated to Senate
2018-03-07HousePassed House (Roll No. 377)
2018-03-07HouseRead 3rd time
2018-03-07HouseOn 3rd reading, Special Calendar
2018-03-06HouseRead 2nd time
2018-03-06HouseOn 2nd reading, Special Calendar
2018-03-05HouseRead 1st time
2018-03-05HouseOn 1st reading, Special Calendar
2018-03-03HouseDo pass
2018-02-23HouseTo House Judiciary
2018-02-23HouseTo Judiciary
2018-02-23HouseIntroduced in House
2018-02-22SenateOrdered to House
2018-02-22SenatePassed Senate (Roll No. 172)
2018-02-22SenateRead 3rd time
2018-02-22SenateOn 3rd reading
2018-02-21SenateRead 2nd time
2018-02-21SenateOn 2nd reading
2018-02-20SenateRead 1st time
2018-02-20SenateOn 1st reading
2018-02-19SenateCommittee substitute reported
2018-02-14SenateTo Judiciary
2018-02-14SenateIntroduced in Senate
2018-02-14SenateTo Judiciary
2018-02-14SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

SB543 (Carry Over) 2017-03-08 - To Education

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
2731Amended CodeCitation Text

West Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback