WV SB542 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 24 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-24 - Chapter 110, Acts, Regular Session, 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 24 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-24 - Chapter 110, Acts, Regular Session, 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to Public Energy Authority Act of WV
Title
Relating generally to public electric utilities and facilities fuel supply for existing coal-fired plants
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-10 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 628) (Y: 89 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-10 - House - House receded (Roll No. 627) (Y: 70 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-10 - Senate - Senate refused to concur and requested House to recede (Roll No. 442) (Y: 21 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-09 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 559) (Y: 95 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-09 - House - Amendment adopted (Roll No. 558) (Y: 49 N: 48 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-31 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 266) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-10 - House - House receded (Roll No. 627) (Y: 70 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-10 - Senate - Senate refused to concur and requested House to recede (Roll No. 442) (Y: 21 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-09 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 559) (Y: 95 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-09 - House - Amendment adopted (Roll No. 558) (Y: 49 N: 48 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-31 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 266) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-24 | Senate | Chapter 110, Acts, Regular Session, 2021 |
2021-04-10 | House | Approved by Governor 4/28/21 - House Journal |
2021-04-10 | Senate | Approved by Governor 4/28/21 - Senate Journal |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Approved by Governor 4/28/21 |
2021-04-10 | House | To Governor 4/16/21 - House Journal |
2021-04-10 | Senate | To Governor 4/16/21 - Senate Journal |
2021-04-16 | Senate | To Governor 4/16/21 |
2021-04-10 | Senate | House Message received |
2021-04-10 | House | Completed legislative action |
2021-04-10 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2021-04-10 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 628) |
2021-04-10 | House | House receded (Roll No. 627) |
2021-04-10 | House | House received Senate message |
2021-04-10 | Senate | Communicated to House |
2021-04-10 | Senate | Senate refused to concur and requested House to recede (Roll No. 442) |
2021-04-10 | Senate | House Message received |
2021-04-09 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2021-04-09 | House | Title amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2021-04-09 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 559) |
2021-04-09 | House | Read 3rd time |
2021-04-09 | House | Amendment adopted (Roll No. 558) |
2021-04-09 | House | Amendment reported by the Clerk |
2021-04-09 | House | On 3rd reading with right to amend, Special Calendar |
2021-04-08 | House | Amendment pending |
2021-04-08 | House | Read 2nd time |
2021-04-08 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2021-04-07 | House | Read 1st time |
2021-04-07 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2021-04-06 | House | Do pass |
2021-04-01 | House | To House Energy and Manufacturing |
2021-04-01 | House | To Energy and Manufacturing |
2021-04-01 | House | Introduced in House |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 266) |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2021-03-31 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2021-03-30 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Immediate consideration |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Committee substitute for committee substitute reported |
2021-03-11 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Committee substitute reported, but first to Judiciary |
2021-03-03 | Senate | To Energy, Industry, and Mining |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2021-03-03 | Senate | To Energy, Industry, and Mining then Judiciary |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
24 | 1 | 1c | New Code | See Bill Text |
24 | 2 | 1q | New Code | See Bill Text |
24 | 2 | 21 | New Code | See Bill Text |