WV SB542 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 11 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-02-26 - To House Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to registration fees for military-related special registration plates

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to registration fees for military-related special registration plates

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-11 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 110) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-26HouseTo House Finance
2019-02-26HouseDo pass, but first to Finance
2019-02-12HouseTo House Technology and Infrastructure
2019-02-12HouseTo Technology and Infrastructure then Finance
2019-02-12HouseIntroduced in House
2019-02-11SenateOrdered to House
2019-02-11SenatePassed Senate (Roll No. 110)
2019-02-11SenateRead 3rd time
2019-02-11SenateOn 3rd reading
2019-02-08SenateRead 2nd time
2019-02-08SenateOn 2nd reading
2019-02-07SenateRead 1st time
2019-02-07SenateOn 1st reading
2019-02-06SenateMotion to refer to Finance not made
2019-02-06SenateReported do pass, but first to Finance
2019-02-06SenateOriginating in Senate Transportation and Infrastructure

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
17A314Amended CodeCitation Text

West Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback