WV SB538 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-16 - Chapter 236, Acts, Regular Session, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to WV Highway Design-Build Pilot Program

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to WV Highway Design-Build Pilot Program

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-09 - Senate - Effective from passage (Roll No. 529) (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-03-09 - Senate - Senate concurred in House amendments and passed bill (Roll No. 529) (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-03-08 - House - Effective from passage (Roll No. 608) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-08 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 607) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-25 - Senate - Effective from passage (Roll No. 222) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-25 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 222) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-16SenateChapter 236, Acts, Regular Session, 2019
2019-03-09SenateApproved by Governor 3/27/19 - Senate Journal
2019-03-27SenateApproved by Governor 3/27/19
2019-03-09HouseApproved by Governor 3/27/19 - House Journal
2019-03-09HouseTo Governor 3/22/19 - House Journal
2019-03-09SenateTo Governor 3/22/19 - Senate Journal
2019-03-22SenateTo Governor 3/22/19
2019-03-09SenateCompleted legislative action
2019-03-09SenateCommunicated to House
2019-03-09SenateEffective from passage (Roll No. 529)
2019-03-09SenateSenate concurred in House amendments and passed bill (Roll No. 529)
2019-03-09SenateHouse Message received
2019-03-08HouseCommunicated to Senate
2019-03-08HouseEffective from passage (Roll No. 608)
2019-03-08HouseTitle amendment adopted (Voice vote)
2019-03-08HousePassed House (Roll No. 607)
2019-03-08HouseRead 3rd time
2019-03-08HouseOn 3rd reading, Special Calendar
2019-03-07HouseRead 2nd time
2019-03-07HouseOn 2nd reading, Special Calendar
2019-03-06HouseRead 1st time
2019-03-06HouseOn 1st reading, Special Calendar
2019-03-05HouseDo pass
2019-02-26HouseTo House Finance
2019-02-26HouseTo Finance
2019-02-26HouseIntroduced in House
2019-02-25SenateOrdered to House
2019-02-25SenateEffective from passage (Roll No. 222)
2019-02-25SenatePassed Senate (Roll No. 222)
2019-02-25SenateRead 3rd time
2019-02-25SenateOn 3rd reading
2019-02-23SenateRead 2nd time
2019-02-23SenateOn 2nd reading
2019-02-22SenateRead 1st time
2019-02-22SenateOn 1st reading
2019-02-21SenateCommittee substitute reported
2019-02-06SenateTo Transportation and Infrastructure
2019-02-06SenateIntroduced in Senate
2019-02-06SenateTo Transportation and Infrastructure
2019-02-06SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB3027 (Similar To) 2019-02-12 - To House Technology and Infrastructure

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
172D2Amended CodeCitation Text

West Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback