WV SB536 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 16 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-17 - To House Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 16 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-17 - To House Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to authorize the tracking of wounded or injured deer or bear with leashed dogs.
Title
Authorizing tracking of wounded or injured bear or deer
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-16 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 130) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-17 | House | To House Judiciary |
2017-03-17 | House | To Judiciary |
2017-03-17 | House | Introduced in House |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 130) |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2017-03-16 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2017-03-15 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2017-03-14 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2017-03-13 | Senate | Reported do pass |
2017-03-07 | Senate | To Natural Resources |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2017-03-07 | Senate | To Natural Resources |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
20 | 2 | 16 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
20 | 2 | 5i | New Code | See Bill Text |