WV SB534 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 29 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-03-30 - To House Government Organization
Pending: House Government Organization Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

The purpose of this bill is to create incentives for local governments to consolidate in an effort to save money on local services.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to incentives for consolidating local governments

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-03-29 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 276) (Y: 28 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-03-30HouseTo House Government Organization
2017-03-30HouseTo Government Organization
2017-03-30HouseIntroduced in House
2017-03-29SenateOrdered to House
2017-03-29SenatePassed Senate (Roll No. 276)
2017-03-29SenateRead 3rd time
2017-03-29SenateOn 3rd reading
2017-03-28SenateRead 2nd time
2017-03-28SenateOn 2nd reading
2017-03-27SenateRead 1st time
2017-03-27SenateOn 1st reading
2017-03-25SenateCommittee substitute reported
2017-03-07SenateTo Government Organization
2017-03-07SenateIntroduced in Senate
2017-03-07SenateTo Government Organization
2017-03-07SenateFiled for introduction

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
11222Amended CodeCitation Text
312010aAmended CodeCitation Text
711B3Amended CodeCitation Text
711B4Amended CodeCitation Text
711B7Amended CodeCitation Text
7A24Amended CodeCitation Text
7A25New CodeSee Bill Text

West Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback