WV SB53 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-02 - To House Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-02 - To House Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Providing next of kin criminally responsible for relative's death may not be involved in burial arrangements
Title
Providing person criminally responsible for another's death may not be involved in burial arrangements
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-01 - Senate - Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 48) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-02 | House | To House Judiciary |
2021-03-02 | House | To Judiciary |
2021-03-02 | House | Introduced in House |
2021-03-01 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2021-03-01 | Senate | Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 48) |
2021-03-01 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2021-03-01 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2021-02-26 | Senate | Floor amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2021-02-26 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Laid over on 2nd reading 2/25/21 |
2021-02-24 | Senate | Laid over on 2nd reading 2/24/21 |
2021-02-24 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2021-02-23 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2021-02-23 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Committee substitute reported |
2021-02-10 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2021-02-10 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Filed for introduction |