WV SB524 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 20 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-20 - Chapter 136, Acts, Regular Session, 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 20 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-20 - Chapter 136, Acts, Regular Session, 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Placing duties and functions of certain boards and commissions under Department of Arts, Culture, and History
Title
Placing duties and functions of certain boards and commissions under Department of Arts, Culture, and History
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-07 - Senate - Senate concurred in House amendments and passed bill (Roll No. 339) (Y: 27 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-05 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 375) (Y: 67 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2022-02-16 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 141) (Y: 25 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-05 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 375) (Y: 67 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2022-02-16 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 141) (Y: 25 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-20 | Senate | Chapter 136, Acts, Regular Session, 2022 |
2022-03-12 | House | Approved by Governor 3/23/22 - House Journal |
2022-03-12 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/23/2022 - Senate Journal |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/23/2022 |
2022-03-10 | House | To Governor 3/9/22 - House Journal |
2022-03-09 | Senate | To Governor 3/9/2022 |
2022-03-08 | House | House received Senate message |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Completed legislative action |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Communicated to House |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments and passed bill (Roll No. 339) |
2022-03-07 | Senate | House Message received |
2022-03-05 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2022-03-05 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 375) |
2022-03-05 | House | Read 3rd time |
2022-03-05 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2022-03-04 | House | Amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2022-03-04 | House | Amendment reported by the Clerk |
2022-03-04 | House | Amendment rejected (Voice vote) |
2022-03-04 | House | Amendment reported by the Clerk |
2022-03-04 | House | Amendment withdrawn (Voice vote) |
2022-03-04 | House | Amendment reported by the Clerk |
2022-03-04 | House | Read 2nd time |
2022-03-04 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2022-03-03 | House | Postponed on 2nd reading, Special Calendar, until 3/4/22 |
2022-03-03 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2022-03-02 | House | Read 1st time |
2022-03-02 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2022-03-01 | House | Do pass |
2022-02-17 | House | To House Government Organization |
2022-02-17 | House | To Government Organization |
2022-02-17 | House | Introduced in House |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 141) |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2022-02-16 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2022-02-15 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2022-02-14 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2022-02-14 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2022-02-11 | Senate | Committee substitute reported |
2022-02-01 | Senate | To Government Organization |
2022-02-01 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2022-02-01 | Senate | To Government Organization |
2022-02-01 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB4504 (Similar To) 2022-02-02 - To House Government Organization
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
10 | 1 | 12 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
10 | 1 | 13 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
10 | 1 | 14 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
10 | 1 | 14a | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
10 | 1 | 15 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
10 | 1 | 16 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
10 | 1 | 17 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
10 | 1 | 18 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
10 | 1 | 18a | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
10 | 1 | 19 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
10 | 1 | 20 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
10 | 1 | 21 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
10 | 1 | 22 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
10 | 1 | 23 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
10 | 1 | 24 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
29 | 1 | 1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
29 | 1 | 8c | New Code | See Bill Text |
29 | 1 | 8D | New Code | See Bill Text |
29 | 27 | 1 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
29 | 27 | 2 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
29 | 27 | 3 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
29 | 27 | 4 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
29 | 27 | 5 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
29 | 27 | 6 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
5F | 2 | 1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |