WV SB524 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 20-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 18 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-03-20 - To House Education
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to WV academic standards

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to WV academic standards

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-03-18 - Senate - Effective from passage (Roll No. 142) (Y: 23 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-03-18 - Senate - Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 142) (Y: 23 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-03-20HouseTo House Education
2017-03-20HouseTo Education
2017-03-20HouseIntroduced in House
2017-03-18SenateOrdered to House
2017-03-18SenateEffective from passage (Roll No. 142)
2017-03-18SenatePassed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 142)
2017-03-18SenateRead 3rd time
2017-03-18SenateOn 3rd reading
2017-03-17SenateFloor amendment adopted (Voice vote)
2017-03-17SenateMotion to lie over bill withdrawn
2017-03-17SenateFloor amendment reported
2017-03-17SenateRead 2nd time
2017-03-16SenateLaid over on 2nd reading 3/16/17
2017-03-16SenateLaid over on 2nd reading 3/15/17
2017-03-15SenateMotion to reconsider rejected
2017-03-15SenateLaid over on 2nd reading 3/15/17
2017-03-15SenateOn 2nd reading
2017-03-14SenateRead 1st time
2017-03-14SenateOn 1st reading
2017-03-13SenateReported do pass
2017-03-11SenateSenator Ojeda requests to be removed as sponsor of bill
2017-03-06SenateTo Education
2017-03-06SenateIntroduced in Senate
2017-03-06SenateTo Education
2017-03-06SenateFiled for introduction

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
182E11New CodeSee Bill Text

West Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback