WV SB522 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-1)
Status: Vetoed on March 27 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-09 - Vetoed by Governor 3/27/19 - House Journal
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on March 27 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-09 - Vetoed by Governor 3/27/19 - House Journal
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Creating Special Road Repair Fund
Title
Creating Special Road Repair Fund
Sponsors
Sen. Randy Smith [R] | Sen. Mark Maynard [R] | Sen. Dave Sypolt [R] | Sen. Eric Tarr [R] |
Sen. Robert Plymale [D] | Sen. Sue Cline [R] | Sen. Patricia Rucker [R] | Sen. Michael Maroney [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-09 - House - Effective July 1, 2019 (Roll No. 755) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-09 - House - House adopted conference report and passed bill (Roll No. 752) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-09 - Senate - Effective July 1, 2019 (Roll No. 522) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-09 - Senate - Senate adopted conference report and passed bill (Roll No. 550) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-08 - House - Effective July 1, 2019 (Roll No. 606) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-08 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 605) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - Senate - Effective July 1, 2019 (Roll No. 271) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 271) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-09 - House - House adopted conference report and passed bill (Roll No. 752) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-09 - Senate - Effective July 1, 2019 (Roll No. 522) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-09 - Senate - Senate adopted conference report and passed bill (Roll No. 550) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-08 - House - Effective July 1, 2019 (Roll No. 606) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-08 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 605) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - Senate - Effective July 1, 2019 (Roll No. 271) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 271) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-09 | House | Vetoed by Governor 3/27/19 - House Journal |
2019-03-09 | Senate | Vetoed by Governor 3/27/19 - Senate Journal |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Vetoed by Governor 3/27/19 |
2019-03-09 | House | To Governor 3/22/19 - House Journal |
2019-03-09 | Senate | To Governor 3/22/19 - Senate Journal |
2019-03-22 | Senate | To Governor 3/22/19 |
2019-03-09 | Senate | House Message received |
2019-03-09 | House | Completed legislative action |
2019-03-09 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2019-03-09 | House | Effective July 1, 2019 (Roll No. 755) |
2019-03-09 | House | House further considered bill |
2019-03-09 | House | House adopted conference report and passed bill (Roll No. 752) |
2019-03-09 | House | Conference report received-House |
2019-03-09 | House | House received Senate message |
2019-03-09 | Senate | Senate requests House to concur |
2019-03-09 | Senate | Effective July 1, 2019 (Roll No. 550) |
2019-03-09 | Senate | Senate adopted conference report and passed bill (Roll No. 550) |
2019-03-09 | House | Conference report filed - House |
2019-03-09 | Senate | Conference report filed - Senate |
2019-03-09 | Senate | To conference |
2019-03-09 | Senate | Communicated to House |
2019-03-09 | Senate | Senate agreed to conference and appoints conferees: Blair, Smith, Plymale |
2019-03-09 | Senate | House Message received |
2019-03-09 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2019-03-09 | House | House appointed conferees: Criss, Linville, Barrett |
2019-03-09 | House | House refused to recede and requested conference(Voice vote) |
2019-03-09 | House | House received Senate message |
2019-03-09 | Senate | Communicated to House |
2019-03-09 | Senate | Senate refused to concur; requested House recede(Voice vote) |
2019-03-09 | Senate | House Message received |
2019-03-08 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2019-03-08 | House | Effective July 1, 2019 (Roll No. 606) |
2019-03-08 | House | Title amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2019-03-08 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 605) |
2019-03-08 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-03-08 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2019-03-07 | House | Committee amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2019-03-07 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-03-07 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2019-03-06 | House | Read 1st time |
2019-03-06 | House | Immediate consideration |
2019-03-06 | House | With amendment, do pass |
2019-02-28 | House | To House Finance |
2019-02-28 | House | To Finance |
2019-02-28 | House | Introduced in House |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Effective July 1, 2019 (Roll No. 271) |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 271) |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Amended on 3rd reading (Voice vote) |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Laid over on 3rd reading 2/26/19 |
2019-02-26 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Floor amendments adopted (Voice vote) |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2019-02-25 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2019-02-23 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2019-02-23 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2019-02-22 | Senate | Committee substitute for committee substitute reported |
2019-02-18 | Senate | To Finance |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Committee substitute reported, but first to Finance |
2019-02-05 | Senate | To Transportation and Infrastructure |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2019-02-05 | Senate | To Transportation and Infrastructure then Finance |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
11 | 13A | 3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
11 | 13A | 3a | Amended Code | Citation Text |
17 | 2A | 6b | New Code | See Bill Text |
17 | 3 | 11 | New Code | See Bill Text |
17 | 30 | 1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
17 | 30 | 2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
17 | 30 | 3 | New Code | See Bill Text |
17 | 30 | 4 | New Code | See Bill Text |
17 | 30 | 5 | New Code | See Bill Text |