WV SB520 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-16 - Chapter 207, Acts, Regular Session, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Requiring entities report drug overdoses

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requiring entities report drug overdoses

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-05 - Senate - Senate concurred in House amendments and passed bill (Roll No. 341) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-04 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 427) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-26 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 244) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-16SenateChapter 207, Acts, Regular Session, 2019
2019-03-09HouseApproved by Governor 3/25/19 - House Journal
2019-03-09SenateApproved by Governor 3/25/19 - Senate Journal
2019-03-25SenateApproved by Governor 3/25/19
2019-03-09HouseTo Governor 3/11/19 - House Journal
2019-03-09SenateTo Governor 3/11/19 - Senate Journal
2019-03-11SenateTo Governor 3/11/19
2019-03-05SenateCompleted legislative action
2019-03-05SenateCommunicated to House
2019-03-05SenateSenate concurred in House amendments and passed bill (Roll No. 341)
2019-03-05SenateHouse Message received
2019-03-04HouseCommunicated to Senate
2019-03-04HousePassed House (Roll No. 427)
2019-03-04HouseRead 3rd time
2019-03-04HouseOn 3rd reading, Special Calendar
2019-03-02HouseCommittee amendment adopted (Voice vote)
2019-03-02HouseRead 2nd time
2019-03-02HouseOn 2nd reading, Special Calendar
2019-03-01HouseRead 1st time
2019-03-01HouseOn 1st reading, Special Calendar
2019-02-28HouseWith amendment, do pass
2019-02-27HouseTo House Health and Human Resources
2019-02-27HouseTo Health and Human Resources
2019-02-27HouseIntroduced in House
2019-02-26SenateOrdered to House
2019-02-26SenatePassed Senate (Roll No. 244)
2019-02-26SenateRead 3rd time
2019-02-26SenateOn 3rd reading
2019-02-25SenateRead 2nd time
2019-02-25SenateOn 2nd reading
2019-02-23SenateRead 1st time
2019-02-23SenateOn 1st reading
2019-02-22SenateCommittee substitute reported
2019-02-04SenateTo Health and Human Resources
2019-02-04SenateIntroduced in Senate
2019-02-01SenateTo Health and Human Resources
2019-02-04SenateFiled for introduction

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
165T3Amended CodeCitation Text
165T4Amended CodeCitation Text

West Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback