WV SB519 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-16 - Chapter 228, Acts, Regular Session, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Requiring county emergency dispatchers complete course for telephonic cardiopulmonary resuscitation

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requiring county emergency dispatchers complete course for telephonic cardiopulmonary resuscitation

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-05 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 462) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 175) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-16SenateChapter 228, Acts, Regular Session, 2019
2019-03-09HouseApproved by Governor 3/26/19 - House Journal
2019-03-09SenateApproved by Governor 3/26/19 - Senate Journal
2019-03-26SenateApproved by Governor 3/26/19
2019-03-09HouseTo Governor 3/20/19 - House Journal
2019-03-09SenateTo Governor 3/20/19 - Senate Journal
2019-03-20SenateTo Governor 3/20/19
2019-03-06SenateHouse Message received
2019-03-05HouseCompleted legislative action
2019-03-05HouseCommunicated to Senate
2019-03-05HousePassed House (Roll No. 462)
2019-03-05HouseRead 3rd time
2019-03-05HouseOn 3rd reading, Special Calendar
2019-03-04HouseRead 2nd time
2019-03-04HouseOn 2nd reading, Special Calendar
2019-03-02HouseRead 1st time
2019-03-02HouseOn 1st reading, Special Calendar
2019-03-01HouseDo pass
2019-02-27HouseTo House Finance
2019-02-27HouseDo pass, but first to Finance
2019-02-22HouseTo House Health and Human Resources
2019-02-22HouseTo Health and Human Resources then Finance
2019-02-22HouseIntroduced in House
2019-02-20SenateOrdered to House
2019-02-20SenatePassed Senate (Roll No. 175)
2019-02-20SenateRead 3rd time
2019-02-20SenateOn 3rd reading
2019-02-19SenateRead 2nd time
2019-02-19SenateOn 2nd reading
2019-02-18SenateRead 1st time
2019-02-18SenateOn 1st reading
2019-02-15SenateReported do pass
2019-02-08SenateTo Finance
2019-02-08SenateReported do pass, but first to Finance
2019-02-04SenateTo Health and Human Resources
2019-02-04SenateIntroduced in Senate
2019-02-01SenateTo Health and Human Resources then Finance
2019-02-04SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB2880 (Similar To) 2019-02-07 - To House Political Subdivisions

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
2465Amended CodeCitation Text

West Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback