WV SB518 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 20 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-20 - Chapter 200, Acts, Regular Session, 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 20 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-20 - Chapter 200, Acts, Regular Session, 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Allowing nurses licensed in another state to practice in WV
Title
Allowing nurses licensed in another state to practice in WV
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-12 - Senate - Effective from passage (Roll No. 495) (Y: 33 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-12 - Senate - Senate concurred in House amendments and passed bill (Roll No. 495) (Y: 33 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-10 - House - Effective from passage (Roll No. 490) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-03-10 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 489) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-02 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 288) (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-03-12 - Senate - Senate concurred in House amendments and passed bill (Roll No. 495) (Y: 33 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-10 - House - Effective from passage (Roll No. 490) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-03-10 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 489) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-02 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 288) (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-20 | Senate | Chapter 200, Acts, Regular Session, 2022 |
2022-03-12 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/28/22 - Senate Journal |
2022-03-28 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/28/22 |
2022-03-12 | House | Approved by Governor 3/28/22 - House Journal |
2022-03-12 | House | To Governor 3/17/22 - House Journal |
2022-03-12 | Senate | To Governor 3/17/2022 - Senate Journal |
2022-03-17 | Senate | To Governor 3/17/2022 |
2022-03-12 | Senate | Completed legislative action |
2022-03-12 | Senate | Communicated to House |
2022-03-12 | Senate | Effective from passage (Roll No. 495) |
2022-03-12 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments and passed bill (Roll No. 495) |
2022-03-12 | Senate | House Message received |
2022-03-10 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2022-03-10 | House | Effective from passage (Roll No. 490) |
2022-03-10 | House | Title amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2022-03-10 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 489) |
2022-03-10 | House | Read 3rd time |
2022-03-10 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2022-03-09 | House | Committee amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2022-03-09 | House | Read 2nd time |
2022-03-09 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2022-03-08 | House | Read 1st time |
2022-03-08 | House | Immediate consideration |
2022-03-08 | House | With amendment, do pass |
2022-03-03 | House | To House Health and Human Resources |
2022-03-03 | House | To Health and Human Resources |
2022-03-03 | House | Introduced in House |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 288) |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2022-03-02 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2022-03-01 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2022-02-28 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2022-02-25 | Senate | Committee substitute reported |
2022-02-01 | Senate | To Health and Human Resources |
2022-02-01 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2022-02-01 | Senate | To Health and Human Resources |
2022-02-01 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB4495 (Similar To) 2022-02-02 - To House Health and Human Resources
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
30 | 7 | 15e | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
30 | 7 | 1a | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
30 | 7 | 20 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
30 | 7 | 3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
30 | 7 | 4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
30 | 7 | 6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
30 | 7 | 7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
30 | 7 | 8 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
30 | 7 | 8a | Amended Code | Citation Text |