WV SB514 | 2018 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous SB514

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 27 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-03-02 - To House Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Enacting Recognition of Emergency Medical Services Personnel Licensure Interstate Compact

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Enacting Recognition of Emergency Medical Services Personnel Licensure Interstate Compact

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-02-27 - Senate - Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 213) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-02HouseTo House Judiciary
2018-03-02HouseDo pass, but first to Judiciary
2018-02-28HouseTo House Government Organization
2018-02-28HouseTo Government Organization then Judiciary
2018-02-28HouseIntroduced in House
2018-02-27SenateOrdered to House
2018-02-27SenatePassed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 213)
2018-02-27SenateRead 3rd time
2018-02-27SenateOn 3rd reading
2018-02-26SenateCommittee amendments adopted (Voice vote)
2018-02-26SenateRead 2nd time
2018-02-26SenateOn 2nd reading
2018-02-23SenateReported do pass, with amendments and title amendment
2018-02-23SenateHaving been read 1st time 2/21/18
2018-02-21SenateOn 2nd reading to Judiciary
2018-02-21SenateRead 1st time
2018-02-21SenateImmediate consideration
2018-02-21SenateCommittee substitute reported, but first to Judiciary
2018-02-09SenateTo Government Organization
2018-02-09SenateIntroduced in Senate
2018-02-09SenateTo Government Organization then Judiciary
2018-02-09SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

SB514 (Carry Over) 2017-03-03 - To Transportation and Infrastructure
HB4547 (Similar To) 2018-02-13 - To House Fire Departments and Emergency Medical Services

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
16541New CodeSee Bill Text
165410New CodeSee Bill Text
165411New CodeSee Bill Text
165412New CodeSee Bill Text
165413New CodeSee Bill Text
165414New CodeSee Bill Text
165415New CodeSee Bill Text
16542New CodeSee Bill Text
16543New CodeSee Bill Text
16544New CodeSee Bill Text
16545New CodeSee Bill Text
16546New CodeSee Bill Text
16547New CodeSee Bill Text
16548New CodeSee Bill Text
16549New CodeSee Bill Text

West Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback