WV SB513 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 26 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-27 - To House Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 26 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-27 - To House Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Protecting consumers against businesses using automatic renewals without consent
Title
Protecting consumers against businesses using automatic renewals without consent
Sponsors
Sen. Glenn Jeffries [D] | Sen. Stephen Baldwin [D] | Sen. Sue Cline [R] | Sen. Richard Lindsay [D] |
Sen. William Ihlenfeld [D] | Sen. Mike Woelfel [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-02-26 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 299) (Y: 33 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-27 | House | To House Judiciary |
2020-02-27 | House | To Judiciary |
2020-02-27 | House | Introduced in House |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 299) |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2020-02-26 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Floor amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2020-02-25 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2020-02-24 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2020-02-21 | Senate | Committee substitute reported |
2020-01-16 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2020-01-16 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2020-01-16 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2020-01-16 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
46A | 6O | 1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
46A | 6O | 2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
46A | 6O | 3 | New Code | See Bill Text |
46A | 6O | 4 | New Code | See Bill Text |
46A | 6O | 5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
46A | 6O | 6 | New Code | See Bill Text |