WV SB510 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 1 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-01 - Chapter 6, Acts, Regular Session, 2023
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 1 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-01 - Chapter 6, Acts, Regular Session, 2023
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Supplementing and amending appropriations to BOE, Department of Education
Title
Supplementing and amending appropriations to BOE, Department of Education
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-03-03 - House - Effective from passage (Roll No. 445) (Y: 89 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2023-03-03 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 444) (Y: 87 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2023-01-27 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 78) (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-01-27 - Senate - Constitutional Rule Suspended (Roll No. 77) (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-03-03 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 444) (Y: 87 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2023-01-27 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 78) (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-01-27 - Senate - Constitutional Rule Suspended (Roll No. 77) (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-01 | Senate | Chapter 6, Acts, Regular Session, 2023 |
2023-03-11 | House | Approved by Governor 3/16/2023 - House Journal |
2023-03-11 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/16/2023 - Senate Journal |
2023-03-16 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/16/2023 |
2023-03-08 | Senate | To Governor 3/8/2023 |
2023-03-08 | House | To Governor 3/8/2023 - House Journal |
2023-03-06 | Senate | House Message received |
2023-03-03 | House | Completed legislative action |
2023-03-03 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2023-03-03 | House | Effective from passage (Roll No. 445) |
2023-03-03 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 444) |
2023-03-03 | House | Read 3rd time |
2023-03-03 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2023-03-02 | House | Read 2nd time |
2023-03-02 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2023-03-01 | House | Read 1st time |
2023-03-01 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2023-02-28 | House | Do pass |
2023-01-30 | House | To House Finance |
2023-01-30 | House | To Finance |
2023-01-30 | House | Introduced in House |
2023-01-27 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2023-01-27 | Senate | Effective from passage (Roll No. 78) |
2023-01-27 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 78) |
2023-01-27 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2023-01-27 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2023-01-27 | Senate | Constitutional Rule Suspended (Roll No. 77) |
2023-01-27 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2023-01-27 | Senate | Immediate consideration |
2023-01-27 | Senate | Committee reference dispensed |
2023-01-27 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2023-01-27 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB3167 (Similar To) 2023-01-31 - To House Finance