WV SB509 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 25 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-10 - On 2nd reading, House Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 25 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-10 - On 2nd reading, House Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Removing requirement that determination of medical stability be found prior to admission to mental health facility
Title
Removing requirement that determination of medical stability be found prior to admission to mental health facility
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-25 - Senate - Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 194) (Y: 23 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-10 | House | On 2nd reading, House Calendar |
2021-04-08 | House | Placed on House Calendar |
2021-04-08 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2021-04-07 | House | Read 1st time |
2021-04-07 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2021-04-06 | House | With amendment, do pass |
2021-04-02 | House | To House Judiciary |
2021-04-02 | House | With amendment, do pass, but first to Judiciary |
2021-03-26 | House | To House Health and Human Resources |
2021-03-26 | House | To Health and Human Resources then Judiciary |
2021-03-26 | House | Introduced in House |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 194) |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Trump Floor amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Laid over on 3rd reading 3/24/21 with right to amend |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Maroney Floor amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Plymale Floor amendment #2 adopted (Voice vote) |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Plymale Floor amendment #1 rejected (Voice vote) |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Unanimous consent to amend |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Plymale Floor amendment withdrawn by unanimous consent |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Laid over on 3rd reading 3/23/21 |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Deferred until foot of 2nd |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Plymale Floor amendment reported |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Stollings Floor amendment rejected (Voice vote) |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Unanimous consent to amend |
2021-03-23 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2021-03-22 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2021-03-19 | Senate | Laid over on 2nd reading 3/19/21 |
2021-03-19 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2021-03-18 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Committee substitute reported |
2021-03-01 | Senate | To Health and Human Resources |
2021-03-01 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2021-03-01 | Senate | To Health and Human Resources |
2021-03-01 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
27 | 5 | 3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
27 | 5 | 3a | New Code | See Bill Text |