WV SB504 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-13 - Chapter 33, Acts, Regular Session, 2016
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-13 - Chapter 33, Acts, Regular Session, 2016
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to confidentiality of juvenile records
Title
Relating to confidentiality of juvenile records
Sponsors
Sen. Bob Ashley [R] | Sen. William Laird [D] | Sen. Mark Maynard [R] | Sen. Ronald Miller [D] |
Sen. Michael Romano [D] | Sen. Chris Walters [R] | Sen. Robert Plymale [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-03-12 - Senate - Senate concurred in House amendments and passed bill (Roll No. 512) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-11 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 517) (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-17 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 131) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-03-11 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 517) (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-17 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 131) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-13 | Senate | Chapter 33, Acts, Regular Session, 2016 |
2016-04-01 | Senate | Approved by Governor 4/1/16 |
2016-03-15 | Senate | Approved by Governor 4/1/16 - Senate Journal |
2016-03-15 | House | Approved by Governor 4/1/2016 - House Journal |
2016-03-15 | Senate | To Governor 3/28/16 - Senate Journal |
2016-03-28 | Senate | To Governor 3/28/16 |
2016-03-15 | House | To Governor 3/28/16 - House Journal |
2016-03-12 | House | House received Senate message |
2016-03-12 | Senate | Completed legislative action |
2016-03-12 | Senate | Communicated to House |
2016-03-12 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments and passed bill (Roll No. 512) |
2016-03-12 | Senate | House Message received |
2016-03-11 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2016-03-11 | House | Title amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2016-03-11 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 517) |
2016-03-11 | House | Read 3rd time |
2016-03-11 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2016-03-10 | House | Committee amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2016-03-10 | House | Read 2nd time |
2016-03-10 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2016-03-09 | House | Read 1st time |
2016-03-09 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2016-03-08 | House | With amendment, do pass |
2016-02-18 | House | To House Judiciary |
2016-02-18 | House | To Judiciary |
2016-02-18 | House | Introduced in House |
2016-02-17 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2016-02-17 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 131) |
2016-02-17 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2016-02-17 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2016-02-16 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2016-02-16 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2016-02-15 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2016-02-15 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2016-02-12 | Senate | Committee substitute reported |
2016-02-03 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2016-02-03 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2016-02-03 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2016-02-03 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
49 | 5 | 101 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
62 | 6B | 2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
62 | 6B | 6 | New Code | See Bill Text |