WV SB502 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-16 - Chapter 245, Acts, Regular Session, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Exempting sales of investment metal bullion and coins

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Exempting sales of investment metal bullion and coins

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-08 - House - Effective July 1, 2019 (Roll No. 604) (Y: 95 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-08 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 603) (Y: 90 N: 9 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-18 - Senate - Effective July 1, 2019 (Roll No. 151) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-18 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 151) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-16SenateChapter 245, Acts, Regular Session, 2019
2019-03-09SenateApproved by Governor 3/27/19 - Senate Journal
2019-03-09SenateApproved by Governor 3/27/19
2019-03-09HouseApproved by Governor 3/27/19 - House Journal
2019-03-09HouseTo Governor 3/20/19 - House Journal
2019-03-09SenateTo Governor 3/20/19 - Senate Journal
2019-03-20SenateTo Governor 3/20/19
2019-03-09SenateHouse Message received
2019-03-08HouseCompleted legislative action
2019-03-08HouseCommunicated to Senate
2019-03-08HouseEffective July 1, 2019 (Roll No. 604)
2019-03-08HousePassed House (Roll No. 603)
2019-03-08HouseRead 3rd time
2019-03-08HouseOn 3rd reading, Special Calendar
2019-03-07HouseRead 2nd time
2019-03-07HouseOn 2nd reading, Special Calendar
2019-03-06HouseRead 1st time
2019-03-06HouseOn 1st reading, Special Calendar
2019-03-05HouseDo pass
2019-02-19HouseTo House Finance
2019-02-19HouseTo Finance
2019-02-19HouseIntroduced in House
2019-02-18SenateOrdered to House
2019-02-18SenateEffective July 1, 2019 (Roll No. 151)
2019-02-18SenatePassed Senate (Roll No. 151)
2019-02-18SenateRead 3rd time
2019-02-18SenateOn 3rd reading
2019-02-15SenateRead 2nd time
2019-02-15SenateOn 2nd reading
2019-02-14SenateRead 1st time
2019-02-14SenateOn 1st reading
2019-02-13SenateCommittee substitute reported
2019-02-01SenateTo Finance
2019-02-01SenateIntroduced in Senate
2019-02-01SenateTo Finance
2019-02-01SenateFiled for introduction

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
11159qNew CodeSee Bill Text

West Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback