WV SB500 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 18 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-20 - To House Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 18 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-20 - To House Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to add language to the West Virginia Code providing clarity in the representation of cases relating to Medicaid fraud and abuse and continuing the fraud control unit in the Medicaid Fraud Control Unit of the Attorney General’s office after July 1, 2017.
Title
Relating to Medicaid fraud and abuse
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-18 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 141) (Y: 24 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-20 | House | To House Judiciary |
2017-03-20 | House | To Judiciary then Finance |
2017-03-20 | House | Introduced in House |
2017-03-18 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2017-03-18 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 141) |
2017-03-18 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2017-03-18 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2017-03-17 | Senate | Floor amendment rejected (Voice vote) |
2017-03-17 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2017-03-17 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2017-03-16 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2017-03-15 | Senate | 2nd reference dispensed |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Committee substitute reported, but first to Judiciary |
2017-03-02 | Senate | To Government Organization |
2017-03-02 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2017-03-02 | Senate | To Government Organization then Judiciary |
2017-03-02 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
9 | 7 | 1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
9 | 7 | 3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
9 | 7 | 6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
9 | 7 | 6a | Amended Code | Citation Text |