WV SB499 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-16 - Chapter 244, Acts, Regular Session, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Amending WV tax laws to conform to changes in partnerships for federal income tax purposes

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Amending WV tax laws to conform to changes in partnerships for federal income tax purposes

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-09 - Senate - Effective July 1, 2019 (Roll No. 528) (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-03-09 - Senate - Senate concurred in House amendments and passed bill (Roll No. 528) (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-03-08 - House - Effective July 1, 2019 (Roll No. 602) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-08 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 601) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - Senate - Effective July 1, 2019 (Roll No. 109) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 109) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-16SenateChapter 244, Acts, Regular Session, 2019
2019-03-09HouseApproved by Governor 3/25/19 - House Journal
2019-03-09SenateApproved by Governor 3/25/19 - Senate Journal
2019-03-25SenateApproved by Governor 3/25/19
2019-03-09HouseTo Governor 3/22/19 - House Journal
2019-03-09SenateTo Governor 3/22/19 - Senate Journal
2019-03-22SenateTo Governor 3/22/19
2019-03-09SenateCompleted legislative action
2019-03-09SenateCommunicated to House
2019-03-09SenateEffective July 1, 2019 (Roll No. 528)
2019-03-09SenateSenate concurred in House amendments and passed bill (Roll No. 528)
2019-03-09SenateHouse Message received
2019-03-08HouseCommunicated to Senate
2019-03-08HouseEffective July 1, 2019 (Roll No. 602)
2019-03-08HouseTitle amendment adopted (Voice vote)
2019-03-08HousePassed House (Roll No. 601)
2019-03-08HouseRead 3rd time
2019-03-08HouseOn 3rd reading, Special Calendar
2019-03-07HouseCommittee amendment adopted (Voice vote)
2019-03-07HouseRead 2nd time
2019-03-07HouseOn 2nd reading, Special Calendar
2019-03-06HouseRead 1st time
2019-03-06HouseOn 1st reading, Special Calendar
2019-03-05HouseWith amendment, do pass
2019-02-12HouseTo House Finance
2019-02-12HouseTo Finance
2019-02-12HouseIntroduced in House
2019-02-11SenateOrdered to House
2019-02-11SenateEffective July 1, 2019 (Roll No. 109)
2019-02-11SenatePassed Senate (Roll No. 109)
2019-02-11SenateRead 3rd time
2019-02-11SenateOn 3rd reading
2019-02-08SenateRead 2nd time
2019-02-08SenateOn 2nd reading
2019-02-07SenateRead 1st time
2019-02-07SenateOn 1st reading
2019-02-06SenateReported do pass
2019-02-01SenateTo Finance
2019-02-01SenateIntroduced in Senate
2019-02-01SenateTo Finance
2019-02-01SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB2798 (Similar To) 2019-02-01 - To House Finance

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
111014Amended CodeCitation Text
111015Amended CodeCitation Text
111016Amended CodeCitation Text
111018cNew CodeSee Bill Text
11103Amended CodeCitation Text
11104Amended CodeCitation Text
11107Amended CodeCitation Text
11213Amended CodeCitation Text
112137aNew CodeSee Bill Text
112137bNew CodeSee Bill Text
112137cNew CodeSee Bill Text
112151aAmended CodeCitation Text
112159Amended CodeCitation Text
112159aNew CodeSee Bill Text
112171aAmended CodeCitation Text
1121A1New CodeSee Bill Text
1121A10New CodeSee Bill Text
1121A11New CodeSee Bill Text
1121A12New CodeSee Bill Text
1121A2New CodeSee Bill Text
1121A3New CodeSee Bill Text
1121A4New CodeSee Bill Text
1121A5New CodeSee Bill Text
1121A6New CodeSee Bill Text
1121A7New CodeSee Bill Text
1121A8New CodeSee Bill Text
1121A9New CodeSee Bill Text
112420Amended CodeCitation Text

West Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback