WV SB497 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 23 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-23 - Chapter 1, Acts, Regular Session, 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 23 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-23 - Chapter 1, Acts, Regular Session, 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to modify the liability of a physician offering volunteer care at school sporting events to provide that they may only be held liable for acts of gross negligence or willful misconduct.
Title
Relating to liability for health care providers who provide services at school athletic events
Sponsors
Sen. Ron Stollings [D] | Sen. Tom Takubo [R] | Sen. Robert Plymale [D] | Sen. Michael Maroney [R] |
Sen. Douglas Facemire [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-03-31 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 286) (Y: 91 N: 8 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-15 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 122) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-15 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 122) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-23 | Senate | Chapter 1, Acts, Regular Session, 2017 |
2017-04-09 | House | Approved by Governor 4/11/17 - House Journal |
2017-04-09 | Senate | Approved by Governor 4/11/17 - Senate Journal |
2017-04-11 | Senate | Approved by Governor 4/11/17 |
2017-04-07 | House | To Governor 4/6/17 - House Journal |
2017-04-06 | Senate | To Governor 4/6/17 |
2017-04-01 | Senate | House Message received |
2017-03-31 | House | Completed legislative action |
2017-03-31 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2017-03-31 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 286) |
2017-03-31 | House | Read 3rd time |
2017-03-31 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2017-03-30 | House | Read 2nd time |
2017-03-30 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2017-03-29 | House | Read 1st time |
2017-03-29 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2017-03-28 | House | Do pass |
2017-03-16 | House | To House Judiciary |
2017-03-16 | House | To Judiciary |
2017-03-16 | House | Introduced in House |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 122) |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2017-03-15 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2017-03-14 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2017-03-13 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2017-03-13 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2017-03-11 | Senate | Committee substitute reported |
2017-03-02 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2017-03-02 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2017-03-02 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2017-03-02 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
55 | 7 | 19 | Amended Code | Citation Text |