WV SB493 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 3 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-04-08 - To House Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 3 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-04-08 - To House Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to provide standards for conversions and retrofits of diesel and gasoline vehicles to alternative fuels.
Title
Providing standards for converting and retrofitting motor vehicles to alternative fuels
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-04-03 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 22) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-08 | House | To House Judiciary |
2013-04-08 | House | Do pass, but first to Judiciary |
2013-04-04 | House | To House Natural Resources |
2013-04-04 | House | To Natural Resources then Judiciary |
2013-04-04 | House | Introduced in House |
2013-04-03 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2013-04-03 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 22) |
2013-04-03 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2013-04-03 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2013-04-02 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2013-04-02 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2013-04-01 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2013-04-01 | Senate | Immediate consideration |
2013-04-01 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2013-04-01 | Senate | Reported do pass |
2013-03-27 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2013-03-27 | Senate | Committee substitute reported, but first to Judiciary |
2013-03-11 | Senate | To Transportation and Infrastructure |
2013-03-11 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2013-03-11 | Senate | To Transportation and Infrastructure then Judiciary |
2013-03-11 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
17A | 13 | 1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
17A | 13 | 2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
17A | 13 | 3 | New Code | See Bill Text |
17A | 13 | 4 | New Code | See Bill Text |
17A | 13 | 5 | New Code | See Bill Text |